Ritz-Craft Corporation of Michigan, Inc. v. GDH Housing, LLC

Plaintiff: Ritz-Craft Corporation of Michigan, Inc.
Defendant: GDH Housing, LLC
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv00105
Filed: September 10, 2013
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Williams
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2013 13 Featured Case ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/16/2014 at 10:00 AM CST by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
January 3, 2014 19 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 17 Motion Postpone or Reschedule Scheduling Conference. The scheduling conference set for 1/16/2014 is cancelled with the understanding thatit shall be rescheduled at a date and time to be determined. (BG) Distributed on 1/3/2014 (jt).
January 21, 2014 28 Featured Case ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/24/2014 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
February 13, 2014 30 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 14 Motion to Strike; denying 21 Motion to File First Amended Answer; and Directing Defendant to File Answer to Complaint. (KT)
March 11, 2014 36 Featured Case ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/28/2015 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)
March 19, 2014 41 Featured Case ORDER adopting 38 Stipulation Regarding Escrow Funds by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
October 7, 2013 8 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Holly L. Cline; granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert J. Tribeck. (BG) Distributed to Cline and Tribeck on 10/7/2013. (rm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ritz-Craft Corporation of Michigan, Inc. v. GDH Housing, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ritz-Craft Corporation of Michigan, Inc.
Represented By: James S. Hill
Represented By: Holly L. Cline
Represented By: Rebecca S. Thiem
Represented By: Robert J. Tribeck
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GDH Housing, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]