United States et al v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company et al

Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company and Marshall's Electric, Inc.
Plaintiff: SolstenXP Electric & Telecom, LLC and United States
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv00115
Filed: September 23, 2013
 
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Ward
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
 
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 2, 2013 17 Featured Case ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/6/2014 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
January 2, 2014 19 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. granting 18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Craig Richards. (KT) NEF regenerated to Richards on 1/2/2014. (rm)
January 6, 2014 22 Featured Case ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/9/2015 at 2:00 PM CDT by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States et al v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Lindsay Walker Hobson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall's Electric, Inc.
Represented By: Lindsay Walker Hobson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SolstenXP Electric & Telecom, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Andrews Herman
Represented By: Ross A. Nilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Ross A. Nilson
Represented By: Sarah Andrews Herman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]