BNSF Railway Company v. Wolla Trucking, LLC

Plaintiff: BNSF Railway Company
Defendant: Wolla Trucking, LLC
Case Number: 4:2013cv00130
Filed: November 7, 2013
Court: North Dakota District Court
Office: Northwestern Office
County: Williams
Presiding Judge: Daniel L. Hovland
Referring Judge: Charles S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 13, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/7/2015 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
September 3, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 10/1/2014 at 9:00 AM in Bismarck Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. (BG)
January 13, 2014 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/13/2014 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr. By Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr.(KT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BNSF Railway Company v. Wolla Trucking, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Rebecca S. Thiem
Represented By: James S. Hill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wolla Trucking, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]