Cliffs Sales Company v. American Steamship Company

Plaintiff: Cliffs Sales Company
Defendant: American Steamship Company
 
Case Number: 1:2007cv00485
Filed: February 21, 2007
 
Court: Ohio Northern District Court
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Cuyahoga
Presiding Judge: Donald C. Nugent
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 18, 2008 161 Featured Case Memorandum Opinion and Order denying Amercian Steamship Company's Motion for judgment as a matter of law, or in the alternative, for a new trial. In addition, the motion of Defendant Oglebay for a New Trial ( ECF #114 in Case No. 07CV1466) is denied. Signed by Judge Donald C. Nugent on 8/18/2008.(Related Doc # 140 )(B,B)
August 18, 2008 162 Featured Case Memorandum Opinion and Order that: the Judgment will be amended to reflect the stipulation of the parties that Northshore Mining Company will benefit and be bound by the judgment in the consolidated actions in the same manner as Cliffs. Any judgment as to Cliffs would be applicable to the claims and defenses of Northshore. The parties are directed to submit their estimate of prejudgment interest that should be assessed in this case calculated as directed in this opinion within 10 days of the issuance of this Order. Thereafter, the Court will enter an Amended Judgment in accordance with this opinion. Signed by Judge Donald C. Nugent on 8/18/2008.(Related Doc # 148 )(B,B)
August 27, 2008 163 Featured Case Memorandum Opinion and Order that: the objections of ASC and Oglebay to Cliffs' Bill of Costs are overruled. Cliffs' Bill of Costs in the amount of $24,863.99 is approved and will be included in the Amended Judgment. Signed by Judge Donald C. Nugent on 8/25/2008. (Related doc 153 )(B,B)
May 6, 2008 85 Featured Case Memorandum Opinion and Order denying Motions for partial summary judgment filed by Cliffs Sales company and American Steamship Company. Signed by Judge Donald C. Nugent on 5/5/2008.(Related doc 56 , 57 )(B,B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Cliffs Sales Company v. American Steamship Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cliffs Sales Company
Represented By: Jason S. Veloso
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Steamship Company
Represented By: Michael J. Montgomery
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]