Babler et al v. Futhey et al

Defendant: Malcolm B Futhey, Jr., Executive Board of the United Transportation Union, James Huston, John Risch, Joseph Boda, Jr., Stephen T. Dawson, Kevin Goring, David M. Murphy, James P. Jones and Delbert G. Strunk
Plaintiff: John W Babler, Victor Baffoni, Roy G Boling, James M Brunkenhoefer, James R. Cumby, John D. Fitzgerald and Constantino A. Iannone
Case Number: 1:2008cv00912
Filed: April 9, 2008
Court: Ohio Northern District Court
Office: Labor: Reporting/Disclosure Office
County: Cuyahoga
Presiding Judge: Patricia A. Gaughan
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:0401 Labor Management Disclosure Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 2, 2009 111 Opinion or Order of the Court Order denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order / Preliminary Injunction (Related Doc # 90 ). Judge John R. Adams on 2/2/09.(A,E)
May 12, 2009 130 Opinion or Order of the Court Order denying Defendants' Motion for preliminary injunction (Related Doc # 113 ). Judge John R. Adams on 5/12/09.(A,E)
November 18, 2009 170 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum of Opinion and Order granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order(Related Doc # 137 ). The Court waives the posting of a bond. Please see Order for additional information. Signed by Judge John R. Adams on 11/18/09.(A,E) Modified text on 11/19/2009 (R,Sh).
March 8, 2011 222 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting Defendants Joint Motion for Stay, 218 . Further proceedings in the within cause are hereby PERPETUALLY STAYED and the within case is hereby CLOSED, subject to reopening upon written motion of Plaintiff or Defendants, after the D.C. litigation is concluded. Judge John R. Adams on 3/8/11. (R,Sh)
August 12, 2008 33 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum, Opinion and Order denying Defendants' Motion to dismiss or in the alternative to stay proceedings (Related Doc # 17 ). Judge John R. Adams on 8/12/08.(A,E) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/9/2008: # 1 Corrected Order) (R,Sh). Modified text on 10/9/2008 (P, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Babler et al v. Futhey et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malcolm B Futhey, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Board of the United Transportation Union
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Huston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Risch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Boda, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen T. Dawson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Goring
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Murphy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James P. Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delbert G. Strunk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John W Babler
Represented By: Josie Lipsitz McLennan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Baffoni
Represented By: Josie Lipsitz McLennan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy G Boling
Represented By: Josie Lipsitz McLennan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James M Brunkenhoefer
Represented By: Josie Lipsitz McLennan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R. Cumby
Represented By: Josie Lipsitz McLennan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John D. Fitzgerald
Represented By: Josie Lipsitz McLennan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constantino A. Iannone
Represented By: Josie Lipsitz McLennan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]