Snide v. Discount Drug Mart, Inc.

Plaintiff: Joanne Snide
Defendant: Discount Drug Mart, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00244
Filed: February 3, 2011
 
Court: Ohio Northern District Court
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Medina
Presiding Judge: Lesley Wells
 
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2011 30 Featured Case Memorandum Opinion and Order granting defendant's Motion for leave to reply to objections (Related Doc # 27 ). Judge Lesley Wells(C,KA)
February 8, 2012 31 Featured Case Memorandum of Opinion and Order Adopting Magistrate's Report and Recommendation. For the reasons set forth herein, Magistrate Judge White's Report and Recommendation (Related doc # 25 ) is adopted. Judge Lesley Wells on 2/8/2012. (H,CM)
March 20, 2013 64 Featured Case Order Adopting Report and Recommendation and granting parties' joint motion for approval of collective action settlement (related docs 62 and 63 ). Judge Lesley Wells (C,KA)
November 21, 2013 76 Featured Case Order Adopting Report and Recommendation re 75 and granting in part and denying in part plaintiffs' motion 65 for attorney fees and costs as set forth in the R&R. Judge Lesley Wells (C,KA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Snide v. Discount Drug Mart, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Snide
Represented By: Bret C. Perry
Represented By: Keith Hansbrough
Represented By: Donald J. Richardson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discount Drug Mart, Inc.
Represented By: Michael C. Cohan
Represented By: Max E. Dehn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]