Swartz et al v. DiCarlo

Cross_defendant: Emeritus Senior Living, Stephen Komarjanski and Aultman Health Foundation
Plaintiff: Vilma Swartz, Tonimarie Swartz and James R. Swartz, Jr.
Defendant: Mark A. DiCarlo
Case Number: 1:2012cv03112
Filed: December 27, 2012
Court: Ohio Northern District Court
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Christopher A. Boyko
Referring Judge: Kenneth S. McHargh
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2014 103 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum and Order . The motion for prejudgment attachment 87 is GRANTED. The motion to strike 90 plaintiffs' exhibit is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth S. McHargh on 4/15/14.(R,N)
May 23, 2014 117 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order. The Motion for Protective Order (doc. no 110) is DENIED as moot in light of the parties' understanding. Other miscellaneous matters pertaining to discovery were placed on the record. The undersigned will retain jurisdiction over the discovery disputes discussed in the telephone conference, should any future disputes arise concerning those issues, re 112 . Magistrate Judge Nancy A. Vecchiarelli on 5/23/2014. (M,M)
September 29, 2014 128 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order. The Court Adopts the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation (Related doc # 101 ) and Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss the Counterclaim for Intentional Infliction of Emotional Distress (Related doc # 54 ) is granted. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 9/29/2014. (H,CM)
November 17, 2014 136 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Denying defendant DiCarlo's Motion for leave to file an untimely motion for judgment on the pleadings (Related Doc # 133 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth S. McHargh on 11/17/2014.(M,De)
November 21, 2014 137 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Adopting Report and Recommendation 130 recommending the Court grant 108 Motion to Dismiss First Amended "Crossclaim" Against Stephen Komarjanski. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 11/21/2014. (R,D)
March 8, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Adopting 14 Report and Recommendation denying 8 Motion to remand to State Court . Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 3/8/2013. (R,D)
August 6, 2013 63 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Adopting 47 Report and Recommendation granting re 6 Aultman Health Foundation's Motion to dismiss pleading incorrectly designated as a "cross claim", 22 Emeritus Senior Living's Motion for judgment on the pleadings and Notice of Party Dismissal. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 8/6/2013. (R,D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swartz et al v. DiCarlo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Emeritus Senior Living
Represented By: Keith Hansbrough
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Stephen Komarjanski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Aultman Health Foundation
Represented By: Richard S. Milligan
Represented By: Paul J. Pusateri
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vilma Swartz
Represented By: David Harold Boehm
Represented By: Dennis P. Zapka
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonimarie Swartz
Represented By: Dennis P. Zapka
Represented By: David Harold Boehm
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R. Swartz, Jr.
Represented By: Dennis P. Zapka
Represented By: David Harold Boehm
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A. DiCarlo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]