Vassalle et al v. Midland Funding LLC et al

Plaintiff: Martha Vassalle and Jerome Johnson
Defendant: Midland Funding LLC, Midland Credit Management, Inc. and Encore Capital Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv00096
Filed: January 17, 2011
Court: Ohio Northern District Court
Office: Toledo Office
County: Erie
Presiding Judge: David A. Katz
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 12, 2011 160 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & JUDGMENT ENTRY Motion to approve settlement granted 131 . Motion for award of attorney's fees granted 134 . Motion to strike denied as moot 135 . Hon. Richard McQuade appointed as Special Master as stated herein.. Judge David A. Katz on 8/12/11. (G,C)
October 2, 2012 203 Opinion or Order of the Court SPECIAL MASTER ORDER 198 granting deft's Motion for Approval of Proposed Modifications to Affidavit Language. Midland shall revise the affidavits as ordered and submit a copy of the same to the Special Master for his review. Special Master Richard B. McQuade. Issued 10/2/12. (B,CJ)
October 14, 2014 281 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION granting Joint Motion for order approving class-action settlement (Related Doc # 258 ); granting Class Counsel's Motion for attorney's fees (Related Doc # 259 ). Judge David A. Katz on 10/14/14.(G,C)
March 11, 2011 6 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting preliminary injunction against parallel litigation. Judge David A. Katz on 3/11/11. (G,C)
May 17, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order Rubio and James' motion for relief from preliminary injunction is denied. Herrings motion to intervene is granted. Her motion to modify, amend, or clarify the preliminary injunction is granted in part and d enied in part as set forth above. The motion to stay briefing on Herrings motion to modify, amend, or clarify the preliminary injunction is denied. The motion for joinder in the motion to stay is denied as moot. The State of Minnesotas motion to cl arify is granted. Gray and Herbert's motion to dissolve preliminary injunction and dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction is denied. Midlands motion for an order requiring disclosure granted in part.. Judge David A. Katz on 5/17/11. (G,C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vassalle et al v. Midland Funding LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Vassalle
Represented By: Dennis E. Murray, Sr.
Represented By: Donna Jean A. Evans
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Johnson
Represented By: Dennis E. Murray, Sr.
Represented By: Donna Jean A. Evans
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding LLC
Represented By: Theodore W. Seitz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Represented By: Theodore W. Seitz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Encore Capital Group, Inc.
Represented By: Theodore W. Seitz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]