William D. Mundinger Trust U/A 10/13/99 et al v. Zellers

Petitioner: William D. Mundinger Trust U/A 10/13/99, William D. Mundinger, William H. Peters Revocable Trust U/A 4/15/02, William H. Peters, Stanley W. Cosky, Karen A. Mundinger Revocable Trust, Karen A. Mundinger, Deanna V. Peters Revocable Trust, Deanna V. Peters, James L. Messenger, Packer Thomas & Company, Philip Dennison and Lamson & Sessions Company
Respondent: Richard G Zellers
 
Case Number: 4:2008cv01226
Filed: May 16, 2008
 
Court: Ohio Northern District Court
Office: Bankruptcy Withdrawl Office
County: Cuyahoga
Presiding Judge: Christopher A. Boyko
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:0157 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 30, 2012 102 Featured Case Opinion and Order. Trustee Richard Zellers' Motion for partial summary judgment (Related doc # 16 ) is denied. Petitioners' Motion for summary judgment as to the claims of Trustee Richard Zellers (Related doc # 22 ) is granted in part and denied in part. Counsel to confer and submit a proposed case management schedule on any remaining issues. The proposed schedule shall include dates for a settlement conference and proposed trial dates. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 4/30/2012. (H,CM)
April 13, 2009 77 Featured Case Order. On March 6, 2009, the Court ordered the parties to provide cross briefs no later than March 13, 2009, on whether Jones Day may continue to represent Lamson & Sessions Co. The Court orders Defendants Mundinger and Peters to provide, in a ffidavit form, what specific information they, or any agent of YSDI, provided Jones Day in aid of Jones Day's representation YSDI that concerns the same or substantially related subject matter of the claims before this Court filed no later than April 20, 2009, Related 70 Order. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 04/13/09. (M,M)
May 1, 2009 79 Featured Case Opinion and Order. Given this resolution of the disqualification issue, it is not necessary for the Court to hold a hearing to take testimony and evaluate the credibility of the parties on other contested issues of fact bearing on waiver, exis tence of conflict, existence of an attorney-client relationship, or substantial relation of subject matter; those issues are moot. Thus, Jones Day will not be disqualified and may continue to represent Lamson in this matter. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 05/01/09. (M,M)
July 15, 2009 82 Featured Case Order. The Court orders the parties to show cause why the adversary proceeding before this Court should not be stayed pending a determination by the Bankruptcy Court whether to allow or disallow the Amended Proof of Claim. Parties shall file their briefs no later than July 28, 2009. The briefs shall not exceed five pages, Related 81 Notice filed by Richard G Zellers. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 07/15/09. (M,M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: William D. Mundinger Trust U/A 10/13/99 et al v. Zellers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William D. Mundinger Trust U/A 10/13/99
Represented By: Richard J. Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William D. Mundinger
Represented By: Richard J. Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William H. Peters Revocable Trust U/A 4/15/02
Represented By: Richard J. Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William H. Peters
Represented By: Richard J. Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stanley W. Cosky
Represented By: Richard J. Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Karen A. Mundinger Revocable Trust
Represented By: Richard J. Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Karen A. Mundinger
Represented By: Richard J. Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Deanna V. Peters Revocable Trust
Represented By: Richard J. Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Deanna V. Peters
Represented By: Richard J. Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James L. Messenger
Represented By: Richard J. Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Packer Thomas & Company
Represented By: Richard G. Witkowski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Philip Dennison
Represented By: Richard G. Witkowski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lamson & Sessions Company
Represented By: Dustin B. Rawlin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Richard G Zellers
Represented By: Richard G. Zellers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]