Laber et al v. United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union et al

Defendant: Local 2L, United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union and United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union
Plaintiff: Donald Laber and Douglas Whack
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv00640
Filed: March 25, 2013
 
Court: Ohio Northern District Court
Office: Akron Office
County: Summit
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 31, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order: Plaintiffs' motion to remand (Doc. No. 7 ) is denied, plaintiffs' breach of contract and tortious interference with contract claims are dismissed, and plaintiffs are afforded fourteen (14) days to file a motion for leave to amend their complaint, along with a proposed amended complaint. Defendants' motion to dismiss (Doc. No. 8 ), premised on the theory that plaintiffs' claims were not preempted, is denied as moot. If plaintiffs do not timely file a conforming amended complaint, the Court will dismiss the action. Judge Sara Lioi on 1/31/2014. (P,J)
September 25, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order: Plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration (Doc. No. 15 ) is denied, plaintiffs' motion for an extension of time in which to amend the complaint (Doc. No. 17 ) is granted, and plaintiffs' motion to certify (Doc. No. 16 ) is denied as moot. Plaintiffs shall have leave until October 2, 2014, to file an amended complaint that asserts a common law fraud claim that is fully compliant with the requirements set forth in this Opinion and Order. Should plaintiffs timely file such an amended pleading, the Court shall remand this matter to the state court. Should plaintiffs fail to file an amended pleading that relieves this Court of subject matter jurisdiction, the Court shall dismiss the complaint as preempted under Section 301 of the LRMA. (Related Doc # 18 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 9/25/2014. (P,J)
October 3, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court Order: On January 31, 2014, the Court entered a Memorandum Opinion and Order denying plaintiffs' motion to remand this action to state court. (Doc. No. 14 ). Plaintiffs sought reconsideration and also sought leave to amend their complain t to include a fraud claim. The Court denied reconsideration but ruled that plaintiffs' proposed fraud claim was not preempted by federal law. (Doc. No. 25 .) The Court afforded plaintiffs leave to amend their complaint to assert a fraud claim and remove all preempted claims. Plaintiffs have filed a fully compliant amended complaint that sets forth a state law claim for fraudulent misrepresentation and omits any claims that are dependent upon a federal labor contract. (Doc. No. 26 .) Havi ng reviewed plaintiffs' amended complaint, and recognizing that there is not complete diversity of parties or some other basis for federal jurisdiction, the Court remands this matter to the Summit County Court of Common Pleas. Judge Sara Lioi on 10/3/2014. (P,J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Laber et al v. United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local 2L, United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union
Represented By: Jeremiah A. Collins(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Catherine R. Donnelly
Represented By: David M. Fusco(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Joshua B. Shiffrin(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union
Represented By: David M. Fusco(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Catherine R. Donnelly
Represented By: Jeremiah A. Collins(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Joshua B. Shiffrin(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Laber
Represented By: Timothy J. Puin(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Whack
Represented By: Timothy J. Puin(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]