United States of America v. Duckett et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Charles O. Duckett, Evelyn D. Duckett, Marcus Duckett, Katie Duckett, Capital One Bank, Ford Motor Credit Corporation, Erin Capital Management, LLC, Collins Financial Services, Inc., NCO Portfolio Management Capital One, Department of Human Services, First State Bank of Idabel, McCurtain County Board of County Commissioners and McCurtain County Treasurer
 
Case Number: 6:2010cv00084
Filed: March 11, 2010
 
Court: Oklahoma Eastern District Court
Office: Muskogee Office
Presiding Judge: Frank H. Seay
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 28, 2014 160 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Frank H. Seay adopting 156 Report and Recommendation and granting 123 Motion to Confirm Sale. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
July 29, 2014 162 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Frank H. Seay adopting 157 Report and Recommendation and granting 147 Motion to Confirm Sale. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
July 29, 2014 163 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Frank H. Seay adopting 158 Report and Recommendation and granting 127 Motion to Confirm Sale. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
July 29, 2014 164 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Frank H. Seay adopting 159 Report and Recommendation and granting 129 Motion to Confirm Sale. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
April 19, 2010 42 Featured Case ORDER FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Judge Frank H. Seay re: 41 Motion for Default Judgment. (trl, Chambers)
April 20, 2010 47 Featured Case ORDER FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Judge Frank H. Seay Re: 46 Motion for Default Judgment(trl, Chambers)
May 6, 2010 56 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Frank H. Seay granting 55 Motion to Dismiss Party; dismissing McCurtain County Board of County Commissioners and McCurtain County Treasurer (trl, Chambers)
June 16, 2010 62 Featured Case ORDER FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Judge Frank H. Seay RE: 61 Motion for Default Judgment. (trl, Chambers) DOCUMENT STRICKEN - ENTERED IN ERROR, Modified on 6/16/2010 (trl, Chambers).
June 17, 2010 64 Featured Case ORDER FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Judge Frank H. Seay re: 61 Motion for Default Judgment. (trl, Chambers)
July 7, 2010 70 Featured Case JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT by Judge Frank H. Seay entering judgment in favor of United States of America against Charles O. Duckett (terminates case) (trl, Chambers)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. Duckett et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jeanette P. Windsor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles O. Duckett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evelyn D. Duckett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Duckett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie Duckett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Credit Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Capital Management, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collins Financial Services, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NCO Portfolio Management Capital One
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Human Services
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First State Bank of Idabel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCurtain County Board of County Commissioners
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCurtain County Treasurer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]