RoDa Drilling Company et al v. Siegal et al

Plaintiff: RoDa Drilling Company, RoDa, LLC, Roland Arnall, Dawn Arnall and Roland and Dawn Arnall Living Trust, The
Defendant: Richard Siegal, Bippy Siegal, Palace Exploration Company, Palace Operating Company, B&R Exploration Co., Inc., Bistate Oil Management Corporation and Oil and Gas Title Holding Corporation
 
Case Number: 4:2007cv00400
Filed: July 19, 2007
 
Court: Oklahoma Northern District Court
Office: Tulsa Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2009 238 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy ; granting in part and denying in part 195 Motion to Compel (jcm, Dpty Clk)
January 29, 2009 243 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy (Re: 242 Notice (Other), 238 Opinion and Order, Ruling on Motion to Compel ) (jcm, Dpty Clk)
February 5, 2009 250 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy, setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2009 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy) (Re: 225 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoenas Served Upon Zenergy, Inc. or in the Alternative, to Suspend Scheduling Order ) (jcm, Dpty Clk)
February 5, 2009 251 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy, setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Status Report due by 3/5/2009, Replies due by 3/12/2009) (jcm, Dpty Clk)
March 4, 2009 266 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy ; denying 212 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (jcm, Dpty Clk)
June 29, 2009 409 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy ; granting in part and denying in part 301 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 303 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 307 Motion in Limine; denying 308 Motion to Exclude (jcm, Dpty Clk)
July 16, 2009 426 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy granted in part and denied in part (Re: 346 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena as Modified by March 20, 2009 Letter ) (jcm, Dpty Clk)
August 14, 2009 465 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy ; denying 418 Motion to Compel (FHM1, Chambers)
September 24, 2010 490 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy ; granting 471 Motion to Reopen Case (jcm, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: RoDa Drilling Company et al v. Siegal et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RoDa Drilling Company
Represented By: M Benjamin Singletary, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RoDa, LLC
Represented By: M Benjamin Singletary, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roland Arnall
Represented By: M Benjamin Singletary, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Arnall
Represented By: M Benjamin Singletary, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roland and Dawn Arnall Living Trust, The
Represented By: M Benjamin Singletary, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Siegal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bippy Siegal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palace Exploration Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palace Operating Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B&R Exploration Co., Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bistate Oil Management Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oil and Gas Title Holding Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]