Ennis v. Well Renewal, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jerry D Ennis
Defendant: Well Renewal, Inc. (WRI-OKL) and Well Renewal, Inc. (WRI-DEL)
 
Case Number: 4:2007cv00436
Filed: August 10, 2007
 
Court: Oklahoma Northern District Court
Office: Real Property: Foreclosure Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Paul J Cleary
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 16, 2009 61 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge T Lane Wilson (Re: 45 MOTION for Writ of Execution To Sell The Joe Riley Oil and Gas Lease ) (crp, Dpty Clk)
January 16, 2009 62 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge T Lane Wilson (Re: 53 MOTION for Writ of Execution To Sell the Ward Oil and Gas Lease ) (crp, Dpty Clk)
January 16, 2009 63 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge T Lane Wilson (Re: 54 MOTION for Writ of Execution To Sell The Zulkey Oil and Gas Lease ) (crp, Dpty Clk)
January 16, 2009 64 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge T Lane Wilson (Re: 55 MOTION for Writ of Execution To Sell the Ross/Payne Oil and Gas Lease ) (crp, Dpty Clk)
January 16, 2009 65 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge T Lane Wilson (Re: 56 MOTION for Writ of Execution To Sell the Gulley Oil and Gas Lease ) (crp, Dpty Clk)
February 13, 2009 66 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Claire V Eagan ; granting 55 Motion for Writ of Execution; accepting 64 Report and Recommendation (Re: 34 Judgment,, Entering Judgment ) (RGG, Chambers)
February 13, 2009 67 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Claire V Eagan ; granting 45 Motion for Writ of Execution; accepting 61 Report and Recommendation (Re: 34 Judgment,, Entering Judgment ) (RGG, Chambers)
February 13, 2009 68 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Claire V Eagan ; granting 53 Motion for Writ of Execution; accepting 62 Report and Recommendation (Re: 34 Judgment,, Entering Judgment ) (RGG, Chambers)
February 13, 2009 69 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Claire V Eagan ; granting 54 Motion for Writ of Execution; accepting 63 Report and Recommendation (Re: 34 Judgment,, Entering Judgment ) (RGG, Chambers)
February 13, 2009 70 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Claire V Eagan ; granting 56 Motion for Writ of Execution; accepting 65 Report and Recommendation (Re: 34 Judgment,, Entering Judgment ) (RGG, Chambers)
February 18, 2009 76 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge T Lane Wilson (Re: 46 MOTION for Writ of Execution on Persoanl Property and Equipment Located on the Oil and Gas Lease Known as the Ward Lease ) (crp, Dpty Clk)
February 18, 2009 77 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge T Lane Wilson (Re: 47 MOTION for Writ of Execution on Personal Property and Equipment Located on the Oil and Gas Lease Known as the Zulkey Lease (Section 4) ) (crp, Dpty Clk)
February 18, 2009 78 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge T Lane Wilson (Re: 49 MOTION for Writ of Execution on Personal Property and Equipment Located on the Oil and Gas Lease Known as the Zulkey Lease (Section 9) ) (crp, Dpty Clk)
February 18, 2009 79 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge T Lane Wilson (Re: 51 MOTION for Writ of Execution on Personal Property and Equipment Located on the Oil and Gas Lease Known as the Ross/Payne (Payne/State) Lease ) (crp, Dpty Clk)
February 23, 2009 80 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge T Lane Wilson (Re: 58 MOTION for Writ of Execution on Personal Property and Equipment Located on the Oil and Gas Lease Known as the Ross Lease ) (crp, Dpty Clk)
March 13, 2009 82 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Claire V Eagan ; granting 46 Motion for Writ of Execution; accepting 76 Report and Recommendation (Re: 34 Judgment,, Entering Judgment ) (RGG, Chambers)
March 13, 2009 83 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Claire V Eagan ; granting 47 Motion for Writ of Execution; accepting 77 Report and Recommendation (Re: 34 Judgment,, Entering Judgment ) (RGG, Chambers)
March 13, 2009 84 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Claire V Eagan ; granting 49 Motion for Writ of Execution; accepting 78 Report and Recommendation (Re: 34 Judgment,, Entering Judgment ) (RGG, Chambers)
March 13, 2009 85 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Claire V Eagan ; granting 51 Motion for Writ of Execution; accepting 79 Report and Recommendation (Re: 34 Judgment,, Entering Judgment ) (RGG, Chambers)
March 13, 2009 86 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Claire V Eagan ; denying 58 Motion for Writ of Execution; accepting 80 Report and Recommendation (Re: 34 Judgment,, Entering Judgment ) (RGG, Chambers)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ennis v. Well Renewal, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry D Ennis
Represented By: Steven Massey Harris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Well Renewal, Inc. (WRI-OKL)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Well Renewal, Inc. (WRI-DEL)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]