State of Oklahoma v. Small Business Administration et al

Plaintiff: State of Oklahoma
Defendant: Small Business Administration, Crow Real Estate Investments, LLC, Crow Enterprises, LLC, Arvest Bank and Ottawa County Treasurer
Case Number: 4:2009cv00452
Filed: July 15, 2009
Court: Oklahoma Northern District Court
Office: Tulsa Office
County: Ottawa
Presiding Judge: Terence Kern
Referring Judge: T Lane Wilson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2410 Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2012 183 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge T Lane Wilson ; granting 152 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (crp, Dpty Clk)
June 21, 2012 193 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge T Lane Wilson (Nunc Pro Tunc) (Re: 152 MOTION for Order Directing Defendants to Return Excess Commissioners' Award (submitted as part of Doc # 151 ), 183 Opinion and Order, Ruling on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ) (crp, Dpty Clk)
October 9, 2012 236 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Terence Kern ; granting 167 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 168 Motion to Exclude (vah, Chambers)
November 19, 2012 256 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge T Lane Wilson finding the Crow defendants in contempt ; granting 202 Motion for Contempt (kjp, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Oklahoma v. Small Business Administration et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Oklahoma
Represented By: Kelly Francis Monaghan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Small Business Administration
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crow Real Estate Investments, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crow Enterprises, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arvest Bank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ottawa County Treasurer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]