Brown v. Eppler et al

Plaintiff: David L Brown
Defendant: J D Eppler, Ray Willard, Jane Doe, Metropolitan Tulsa Transit Authority, Paul T Boudreaux and Richardson, Richardson & Boudreaux Law Firm
Case Number: 4:2009cv00466
Filed: July 17, 2009
Court: Oklahoma Northern District Court
Office: Tulsa Office
County: Tulsa
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: T Lane Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2011 136 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Claire V Eagan that this is a final order terminating this case and a separate judgment will be entered herewith ; striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s); denying 93 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 94 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 115 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief; denying 116 Motion for Sanctions; finding as moot 121 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief; finding as moot 125 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief; finding as moot 126 Motion to Compel; finding as moot 127 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s); finding as moot 130 Motion to Strike; finding as moot 134 Motion to Strike Document(s) (Re: 1 Complaint ) (RGG, Chambers)
June 8, 2011 155 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Claire V Eagan ; denying 146 Motion for Sanctions; denying 147 Motion to Reconsider; denying 150 Motion for New Trial; denying 152 Motion for Sanctions (Re: 137 Judgment, Entering Judgment,,,,,,,,,,,,, ) (RGG, Chambers)
October 14, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Claire V Eagan granting in part and denying in part 7 motion to dismiss; the only claims remaining are Browns claims against MTTA and the employee defendants based on alleged due process and equal protection viol ations under 42 U.S.C. § 1983. Plaintiff's Application for Preliminary Injunction and Declaratory Relief (Dkt. # 6) is set for hearing before the undersigned in Courtroom # 2, Fourth Floor, Page Belcher Federal Building, on the 3 0th day of October, 2009 at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiff must appear for the evidentiary hearing prepared to present evidence sufficient to support his burden of proof for a preliminary injunction, or the preliminary injunction will be denied. ; setting /resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Evidentiary Hearing set for 10/30/2009 at 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Claire V Eagan); granting in part and denying in part 7 Motion to Dismiss; granting 13 Motion for Hearing; finding as moot 17 Motion to Expedite Ruling (Re: 1 Complaint ) (RGG, Chambers)
April 24, 2014 208 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that plaintiff remains obligated to pay appellate filing fee in monthly installments ; granting 194 Motion for Permanent Injunction; denying 200 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 206 Mot ion for Hearing (Re: 174 Mandate from Circuit Court, 177 Mandate from Circuit Court, 173 Order from Circuit Court, 172 Decision from Circuit Court, 196 Minutes of Status Hearing,,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),,, Adding/Terminating Party(ies),,, Vacating/Setting Aside Order(s),,,,,, Ruling on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, ) (RGG, Chambers)
June 13, 2014 232 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan ; denying 212 Motion for New Trial (Re: 208 Opinion and Order,, Ruling on Motion for Permanent Injunction, Ruling on Motion for Summary Judgment, Ruling on Motion for Hearing,,,,,,,,,, 212 MOTION for New Trial , 209 Judgment, Entering Judgment,,,, ) (RGG, Chambers)
June 18, 2014 238 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Judgment pursuant to Rule 60 of Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Dkt. # 235) is denied. The Court Clerk is directed to return to plaintiff by mail the $ ;4 in cash and the $1 check left at the Court Clerk's office on June 17, 2014. ; denying 235 Motion to Vacate Order/Judgment (Re: 234 Order, Dismissing/Terminating Case,, Ruling on Motion for Release,,,, 237 Notice (Other) ) (RGG, Chambers)
November 6, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Claire V Eagan ; denying 6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Re: 1 Complaint ) (RGG, Chambers)
December 2, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Claire V Eagan that Plaintiff's Application to Obtain Copy of Transcript of Court's Hearing Without Payment of Costs (Dkt. # 33) is denied. Plaintiff may view the transcript free of charge at the computer terminal located in the Court Clerks office. ; denying 33 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (RGG, Chambers)
January 13, 2010 47 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Claire V Eagan that plaintiff may amend his complaint (Dkt. # 1) to add the names of Jane and Janet Doe no later than February 1, 2010; provided, however, that no other amendments will be permitted and no addi tional extensions of the deadline will be granted. ; finding as moot 34 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s); denying 39 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 42 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s); granting 42 Motion to Amend (Re: 1 Complaint ) (RGG, Chambers)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Eppler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David L Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J D Eppler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Willard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Tulsa Transit Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul T Boudreaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richardson, Richardson & Boudreaux Law Firm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.