Crest Resources, Inc. v. Dan Blocker Petroleum Consultants, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Crest Resources, Inc.
Defendant: Dan Blocker Petroleum Consultants, Inc. and Weatherford International, Inc.
 
Case Number: 4:2009cv00766
Filed: December 7, 2009
 
Court: Oklahoma Northern District Court
Office: Tulsa Office
County: Tulsa
Referring Judge: Paul J Cleary
Presiding Judge: Terence Kern
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 19, 2013 106 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul J Cleary setting deadlines re 91 Motion to Compel (Re: 91 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
March 7, 2014 178 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Terence Kern ; granting 112 Motion for Summary Judgment (vah, Chambers)
March 19, 2014 186 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Granting Doc. 113; terminating only "third-party" plaintiff and "third-party" defendant ; terminating party Weatherford International, Inc. (a Delaware corporation), Hexion Specialty Chemicals, Inc. and Hexion Specialty Chemicals, Inc. ; granting 113 Motion for Summary Judgment (vah, Chambers)
March 29, 2012 79 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Terence Kern ; granting in part and denying in part 61 Motion for Summary Judgment (vah, Chambers)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Crest Resources, Inc. v. Dan Blocker Petroleum Consultants, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crest Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Richard L Rose
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Blocker Petroleum Consultants, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weatherford International, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]