Morrison v. Chartis Property and Casualty Company

Defendant: Chartis Property and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Nancy Morrison
Case Number: 4:2013cv00116
Filed: February 26, 2013
Court: Oklahoma Northern District Court
Office: Tulsa Office
County: Tulsa
Referring Judge: Paul J Cleary
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 4, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul J Cleary ; granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion to Compel (kjp, Dpty Clk)
April 1, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Judge John E Dowdell ; denying 47 Objection to Magistrate Judge's Order (Re: 46 Order, Ruling on Motion to Compel ) (SAS, Chambers)
October 3, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul J Cleary ; denying 67 Motion to Compel (tjc, Dpty Clk)
October 3, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul J Cleary denying Motion to Compel (Re: 67 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents ) (crp, Dpty Clk) Modified on 10/3/2014 ENTERED IN ERROR - DUPLICATE FILING OF DKT. 76 (crp, Dpty Clk).
October 20, 2014 88 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul J Cleary ; granting 69 Motion to Quash (kjp, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morrison v. Chartis Property and Casualty Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chartis Property and Casualty Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Morrison
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]