Valley View Angus Ranch Inc et al v. Duke Energy Field Services LP

Case Number: 5:2004cv00191
Filed: February 25, 2004
Court: Oklahoma Western District Court
Office: Oklahoma City Office
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 18, 2009 229 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 209 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 209 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 8/18/2009. (mb, )
August 21, 2009 230 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 210 Motion for Costs; denying 224 Motion to Review Taxation of Costs. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 8/21/2009. (mb, )
August 28, 2009 234 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 212 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 8/28/2009. (mb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valley View Angus Ranch Inc et al v. Duke Energy Field Services LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.