Deborah G Mallow IRA SEP Investment Plan et al v. McClendon et al

Plaintiff: Deborah G Mallow IRA SEP Investment Plan
Defendant: Aubrey K McClendon, Richard K Davidson, Kathleen M Eisbrenner, V Burns Hargis, Frank Keating, Charles T Maxwell, Merrill A Miller, Jr, Don L Nickles, Lou Simpson and Chesapeake Energy Corporation
Case Number: 5:2012cv00436
Filed: April 19, 2012
Court: Oklahoma Western District Court
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Vicki Miles-LaGrange
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 16, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying the portion of plaintiff's motion 17 which requests limited expedited discovery (as more fully set out in order). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 5/16/2012. (ks)
June 6, 2012 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 18 plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (as more fully set out in order). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 6/6/2012. (ks)
July 13, 2012 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Dolezal's Motion to Consolidate Cases and to Appoint Lead Counsel Structure [docket no. 7 in Case No. CIV-12-477-M], denying the Initial Mallow Group's Cross-Motion to Consolidate All Related Cases and to Appoint Lead Counsel [docket no. 15 in Case No. CIV-12-436-M], denying Erickson's Motion to Consolidate and Appoint Lead Counsel [docket no. 15 in Case No. CIV-12-631-M], and granting in part and denying in part Shochat's Cross-Motion for Consolidation of Relat ed Cases and Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel [docket no. 7 in Case No. CIV-12-488-M] as follows: the Court grants Shochat's crossmotion for consolidation of related cases and appointment of lead counsel and denies Shochat's motion for appointment of lead plaintiff. The Court will issue a separate order consolidating the related cases and appointing lead counsel (as more fully set out in order). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 7/13/2012. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deborah G Mallow IRA SEP Investment Plan et al v. McClendon et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah G Mallow IRA SEP Investment Plan
Represented By: Kenyatta R Bethea
Represented By: Kenyatta R Bethea
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aubrey K McClendon
Represented By: James R Webb
Represented By: Spencer F Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard K Davidson
Represented By: James R Webb
Represented By: Spencer F Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen M Eisbrenner
Represented By: James R Webb
Represented By: Spencer F Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V Burns Hargis
Represented By: James R Webb
Represented By: Spencer F Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Keating
Represented By: Spencer F Smith
Represented By: James R Webb
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles T Maxwell
Represented By: Spencer F Smith
Represented By: James R Webb
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill A Miller, Jr
Represented By: Spencer F Smith
Represented By: James R Webb
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don L Nickles
Represented By: Spencer F Smith
Represented By: James R Webb
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lou Simpson
Represented By: Spencer F Smith
Represented By: James R Webb
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Energy Corporation
Represented By: Spencer F Smith
Represented By: James R Webb
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]