Collins et al v. Great Plains Oilfield Rental LLC

Plaintiff: Daven Collins and Thialynn Elaine Collins
Defendant: Great Plains Oilfield Rental LLC
 
Case Number: 5:2012cv01108
Filed: October 9, 2012
 
Court: Oklahoma Western District Court
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Vicki Miles-LaGrange
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 7, 2013 42 Featured Case ORDER granting 35 Great Plains Oilfield Rental, LLC's Partial Motion to Dismiss (as more fully set out in order). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 6/7/2013. (ks)
October 28, 2013 81 Featured Case ORDER denying 69 Collins' motion to strike Delta's motion and granting 63 Delta's motion for judgment on the pleadings (as more fully set out in order). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 10/28/2013. (ks)
December 13, 2013 89 Featured Case ORDER denying 82 Plaintiffs' Motion to Reconsider an Order (as more fully set out in order). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 12/13/2013. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Collins et al v. Great Plains Oilfield Rental LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daven Collins
Represented By: Tom E Mullen
Represented By: Mark W Albert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thialynn Elaine Collins
Represented By: Mark W Albert
Represented By: Tom E Mullen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Plains Oilfield Rental LLC
Represented By: Daniel E Bryan, III
Represented By: Richard E Hornbeek
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]