Ortiz et al v. Cooper Tire & Rubber Company

Plaintiff: Manuella Ortiz, Carlos Morales and Rolando Morales
Defendant: Cooper Tire & Rubber Company
Case Number: 5:2013cv00032
Filed: January 8, 2013
Court: Oklahoma Western District Court
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: Texas
Presiding Judge: Timothy D. DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 25, 2015 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 03/25/2015. (wh)
May 16, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 7 Motion to Strike 1 Complaint. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 5/16/2013. (mb)
August 13, 2014 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 35 Motion to Permit the Use of Confidential Documents. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 8/13/2014. (mb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz et al v. Cooper Tire & Rubber Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuella Ortiz
Represented By: Kyle Wayne Farrar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Morales
Represented By: Kyle Wayne Farrar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rolando Morales
Represented By: Kyle Wayne Farrar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Tire & Rubber Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]