Boatright Family LLC v. Reservation Center Inc et al

Plaintiff: Boatright Family LLC
Defendant: Reservation Center Inc, CCRA International Inc, Ourlink LLC and John Does
Case Number: 5:2013cv00192
Filed: February 25, 2013
Court: Oklahoma Western District Court
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D. DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 11, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 7 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 7/11/2013. (mb)
October 7, 2014 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 35 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 44 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 10/7/2014. (mb)
May 14, 2015 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 90 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Defendants Don Buchholz, EACR, Ltd., Hope Harvison, John H. Harvison, Mike Harvison, Randall Harvison, Perry Johns, Jove Investments, Ltd., Richard Marxen, MCRK, Ltd., Kay Parker, Max Poyner, Kenneth Rees, Michael Stinson dismissed. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 5/14/2015. (mb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boatright Family LLC v. Reservation Center Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boatright Family LLC
Represented By: Terry D Kordeliski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reservation Center Inc
Represented By: Michael L Brooks
Represented By: Clyde R Woody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCRA International Inc
Represented By: Michael L Brooks
Represented By: Clyde R Woody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ourlink LLC
Represented By: Michael L Brooks
Represented By: Clyde R Woody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.