Hipoint Partners LLC et al v. Pathfinder LL&D Insurance Group LLC et al

Plaintiff: Hipoint Partners LLC, L&S Development LLC, Robinson Medical Plaza LLC, BCS Development LLC and A+Mini Storage 4 LLC
Defendant: Pathfinder LL&D Insurance Group LLC, Vericlaim Inc, Lexington Insurance Company, Commercial Industrial Building Owners Alliance Inc and Claims Adjusting Group Inc
Case Number: 5:2013cv00687
Filed: July 3, 2013
Court: Oklahoma Western District Court
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: Cleveland
Presiding Judge: Timothy D. DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 9, 2015 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that parties shall file a disclosure statement in compliance with LCvR7.1.1 within seven days. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 04/09/2015. (wh)
April 17, 2015 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER as to LLC parties filing second amended disclosure statements within 7 days. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 04/17/2015. (wh)
July 10, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Defendants to File an Amended Notice of Removal to Allege the Existence of Diversity Jurisdiction no later than 7/24/2013. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 7/10/2013. (mb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hipoint Partners LLC et al v. Pathfinder LL&D Insurance Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hipoint Partners LLC
Represented By: Marvin Laws
Represented By: Robert L Magrini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L&S Development LLC
Represented By: Marvin Laws
Represented By: Robert L Magrini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robinson Medical Plaza LLC
Represented By: Marvin Laws
Represented By: Robert L Magrini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BCS Development LLC
Represented By: Marvin Laws
Represented By: Robert L Magrini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A+Mini Storage 4 LLC
Represented By: Marvin Laws
Represented By: Robert L Magrini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pathfinder LL&D Insurance Group LLC
Represented By: Don W Danz
Represented By: James K Secrest, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vericlaim Inc
Represented By: J Angela Ables
Represented By: Johnny R Blassingame, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Carson C Smith
Represented By: Bryan E Stanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commercial Industrial Building Owners Alliance Inc
Represented By: J Mark McAlester
Represented By: Michael S McMillin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claims Adjusting Group Inc
Represented By: J Mark McAlester
Represented By: Michael S McMillin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.