Doe v. Josephine County

Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Josephine County
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv02080
Filed: November 16, 2012
 
Court: Oregon District Court
Office: Medford (1) Office
Presiding Judge: Mark D. Clarke
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 8, 2013 25 Featured Case Order regarding in camera review of confidential documents. Signed on 03/08/2013 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
October 7, 2013 63 Featured Case ORDER: The Court Orders production of John Doe 2's probation file to Plaintiff's counsel. Plaintiff may pick up the file at the Clerk's Office. Signed on 10/07/2013 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
January 8, 2014 88 Featured Case ORDER ON DISCOVERY. Please access entire text by document number hyperlink. Signed on 01/08/2014 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke.Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-02080-CL, 1:13-cv-00724-CL (rsm)
March 10, 2014 98 Featured Case ORDER: The Court has reviewed in camera the documents submitted by Josephine County Courts as per the Order 96 granting Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Having verified that the documents pertain to the Plaintiffs in this case, the Court hereby Orders that the documents be remanded to Plaintiff's counsel, Mr. Petersen. Mr. Petersen may retrieve the documents from the Clerk's Office. Signed on 03/10/2014 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke.Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-02080-CL, 1:13-cv-00724-CL (rsm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Doe v. Josephine County
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Thomas N. Petersen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josephine County
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]