Shaw v. Action Financial Services, LLC

Defendant: Action Financial Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Richard Shaw
 
Case Number: 1:2014cv00469
Filed: March 21, 2014
 
Court: Oregon District Court
Office: Medford (1) Office
Presiding Judge: Mark D. Clarke
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 5, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Granting 8 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's claim for common law wrongful discharge; Adopting Findings and Recommendation 18 . Signed on 9/5/2014 by Judge Owen M. Panner. (jkm)
October 9, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: This matter is dismissed for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with a Court Order. The Clerk shall enter Judgment. Signed on 10/09/2014 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
October 10, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED Order in relation to 29 . Signed on 10/09/2014 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Shaw v. Action Financial Services, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Action Financial Services, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Shaw
Represented By: Cynthia J. Gaddis
Represented By: Carl Lee Post
Represented By: Daniel J. Snyder
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]