Winslow v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Elizabeth Winslow
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2013cv00467
Filed: March 19, 2013
Court: Oregon District Court
Office: Pendleton (2) Office
Presiding Judge: Marco A. Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:0405g Review of Commissioner's Final Decision
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 7, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER: The Commissioner's decision is reversed and remanded for a determination of benefits. See 15-page opinion & order attached. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (mr)
July 7, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Granting Application for Fees Pursuant to EAJA 23 . See 1-page order attached. Signed on 7/7/2014 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (mr)
November 19, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Granting Motion for 42 U.S.C. § 406(b) Attorney Fees 27 . See 2-page order attached. Signed on 11/19/2014 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (mr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winslow v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Winslow
Represented By: Tim D. Wilborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Adrian L. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.