Rose v. Miss Pacific LLC et al

Plaintiff: Perry L Rose
Defendant: Miss Pacific LLC, Pacific Fishing LLC and F/V MISS PACIFIC
 
Case Number: 3:2009cv00306
Filed: March 20, 2009
 
Court: Oregon District Court
Office: Marine Office
County: Outside State
Presiding Judge: Janice M. Stewart
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 46:688 Jones Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 10, 2012 119 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER: Granting in Part Denying in Part Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 94 ) as follows: granted as to compensatory damages, punitive damages and attorney fees in Count III (maintenance and cure), as to punitive damages in Count IV (unearned wages), and as to all claims alleged against Pacific Fishing as a shipowner, and otherwise denied. Signed on 1/10/2012 by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. (ST)
March 9, 2009 39 Featured Case ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MISS PACIFIC, LLC AND PACIFIC FISHING, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION, INSUFFICIENT PROCESS, AND LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AND FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE DEFENDANT PACIFIC FISHING, LL C. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants Miss Pacific, LLC and Pacific Fishing, LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Insufficient Process, and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Partial Summary Judgment Re Defendant Pac ific Fishing is GRANTED in part for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, otherwise DENIED in part as to dismissal, and this matter TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for Oregon in lieu of dismissal. This Court's Scheduling Order (Dkt. 3 ) is VACATED. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) [Transferred from Washington Western on 3/20/2009.]
April 28, 2009 59 Featured Case Jury Trial Management Order, regarding 3-4 day jury trial before Judge Stewart on 3/9/2010. Signed on 4/28/2009 by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. (da)
May 21, 2009 61 Featured Case Findings & Recommendation: Motion for Attorney Fees Defendants' Motion for Costs Under RCW 4.28.185(5) 46 should be DENIED. Objections to the Findings and Recommendation are due by 6/8/2009. Signed on 5/21/2009 by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. (stewart1, )
June 15, 2009 63 Featured Case ORDER: Denying Motion for Attorney Fees 46 ; Adopting Findings and Recommendation 61 . Signed on 6/15/09 by Judge Garr M. King. (ljl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Rose v. Miss Pacific LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry L Rose
Represented By: George H. Luhrs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miss Pacific LLC
Represented By: Markus B G Oberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Fishing LLC
Represented By: Markus B G Oberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F/V MISS PACIFIC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]