Tucker v. Cascade General, Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2009cv01491
Filed: December 21, 2009
Court: Oregon District Court
Office: Portland Office
Presiding Judge: John V. Acosta
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 33:0901 Longshore & Harbor Worker's Compensation Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2011 123 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER - Plaintiffs' demand for a jury trial 45 on its claims agaisnt Cascade General is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' request for an advisory jury 45 on its claims against the United States is GRANTED. Cascade General's demand for an advisory jury 48 on its claims against the United States is GRANTED. The United States' claims against Cascade General will be tried to an advisory jury. Dated this 24th day of October, 2011, by U.S. Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (peg)
November 9, 2011 167 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON OBJECTIONS TO WITNESS TESTIMONY - Dated this 9th day of November, 2011, by U.S. Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (peg)
November 9, 2011 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON OBJECTIONS TO EXHIBITS - (re: documents 147 , 90 , 132 , 146 , 126 , 91 , 130 and 149 . Dated this 9th day of November, 2011, by U.S. Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (peg) (
November 9, 2011 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON OBJECTIONS TO DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS - (re: documents 128 , 95 and 89 ). Dated this 9th day of November, 2011, by U.S. Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (peg)
November 9, 2011 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON OBJECTIONS TO SPECIAL DAMAGES ( re: documenets 152 , 120 and 125 ). Dated this 9th day of November, 2011, by U.S. Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (peg)
April 23, 2014 313 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on OBJECTIONS TO WITNESS TESTIMONY - Tucker's Amended Witness List 291 and Defendant's Final Witness List 274 . IT IS SO ORDERED. DATED this 23rd day of April, 2014, by United States Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (see attached 8-page order) (peg)
April 23, 2014 314 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on OBJECTIONS TO EXHIBITS - Tucker's Final Exhibit List 269 and Defendant's Final (Amended) Exhibit List 279 . IT IS SO ORDERED. DATED this 23rd day of April, 2014, by United States Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (see full 8-page order attached to this entry) (peg)
November 13, 2014 357 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT and CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - (see full 58 page attached document for details). ORDER: WITHIN ten (10) days, Tucker shall submit to the cour an appropriate form of JUDGMENT in this matter. DATED this 13th day of November, 2014, by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (peg)
October 18, 2011 92 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER - Cascade's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 48 and Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 46 are GRANTED. IT IS SO ORDERED. Dated this 17th day of October, 2011, by U.S. Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (peg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker v. Cascade General, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]