Allen v. Northwest Permanente, P.C.

Plaintiff: Ona C. Allen
Defendant: Northwest Permanente, P.C.
Case Number: 3:2012cv00402
Filed: March 6, 2012
Court: Oregon District Court
Office: Portland Office
Presiding Judge: Janice M. Stewart
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relatio
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 2, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court ADOPTS Magistrate Judge Stewart's Findings and Recommendation 20 . The Court DENIES Plaintiff's Motion 5 for Remand. Signed on 07/02/2012 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (bb)
November 30, 2012 52 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER . Plaintiff Ona Allen's Motion for Reconsideration 27 is DENIED. Signed on 11/30/12 by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. (jlr)
March 7, 2013 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court ADOPTS Magistrate Judge Stewart's Findings and Recommendation 58 , GRANTS Defendant's Motion 39 for Summary Judgment, and DISMISSES this matter with prejudice. Signed on 03/07/2013 by Judge Anna J. Brown. See attached 4 page Order for full text. (bb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Northwest Permanente, P.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ona C. Allen
Represented By: George P. Fisher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Permanente, P.C.
Represented By: Jamie S. Kilberg
Represented By: Chris Kitchel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]