Nance v. May Trucking Company et al

Defendant: May Trucking Company and Does 1 through 100
Plaintiff: Scott Nance and Frederick Freedman
Case Number: 3:2012cv01655
Filed: September 13, 2012
Court: Oregon District Court
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Marco A. Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 15, 2014 145 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER: Defendant's motion for summary judgment 108 is granted;Plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment 111 is denied; and Defendant's motion to strike 126 is denied. See 18-page opinion & order attached. Signed on 1/15/2014 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (mr)
May 20, 2014 178 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT & CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. The Court finds that Defendant improperly deducted a portion of Plaintiffs wages in violation of ORS § 652.610, but Defendant did not willfully fail to pay Plaintiff all wages due upon termination in violation of ORS § 652.150. Plaintiff is awarded $200 in damages, costs, and reasonable attorney fees. See 9-page document attached. Signed on 5/20/2014 by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (mr)
November 21, 2014 193 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for attorney fees and costs 182 is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff is awarded attorney fees in the amount of $40,603.15 and costs in the amount of $919.07. See 18-page opinion & order attached. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (mr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nance v. May Trucking Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: May Trucking Company
Represented By: Kelli M. Block
Represented By: Kim T. Buckley
Represented By: James H Hanson
Represented By: Christopher C McNatt, Jr
Represented By: R. Jay Taylor, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Nance
Represented By: Allison H. Goddard
Represented By: Steve D. Larson
Represented By: James R. Patterson
Represented By: Jennifer S. Wagner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Freedman
Represented By: Steve D. Larson
Represented By: Allison H. Goddard
Represented By: James R. Patterson
Represented By: Jennifer S. Wagner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]