Klahn v. Clackamas County Bank et al

Plaintiff: Laurie Klahn and Daniel P. Klahn, Sr.
Defendant: Clackamas County Bank, Cable Huston Benedick Haagensen & Lloyd, LLP and Laura J. Walker
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00621
Filed: April 10, 2013
 
Court: Oregon District Court
Office: Portland (3) Office
Presiding Judge: Janice M. Stewart
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 24, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER : Klahn's Motion for an Emergency Order (docket #45) is DENIED; Cable Huston and Walker's Motion to Dismiss (docket #31) is GRANTED and those defendants are dismissed with prejudice, and the Bank's Motion to Dismiss (docket #36) is GRANTED with leave granted to the Klahns to file an Amended Complaint by August 23, 2013. The failure to timely file an Amended Complaint will result in dismissal of this case. Signed on 7/24/13 by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. (jlr)
December 12, 2013 85 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint 65 . The only remaining claim is part of Claim 4 alleging intentional interference with Plaintiff's tenant-landlord relationship. See the attachment for further details. Signed on 12/12/2013 by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. (ST)
January 2, 2014 90 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions 78 . Signed on 1/2/2014 by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. (ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Klahn v. Clackamas County Bank et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Klahn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel P. Klahn, Sr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clackamas County Bank
Represented By: Laura J. Walker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cable Huston Benedick Haagensen & Lloyd, LLP
Represented By: Janet Marie Schroer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura J. Walker
Represented By: Janet Marie Schroer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]