Keith Goodridge Construction et al v. WYBS, Inc.

Defendant: WYBS, Inc.
Plaintiff: Keith Goodridge Construction and Keith Goodridge
 
Case Number: 6:2008cv06313
Filed: October 9, 2008
 
Court: Oregon District Court
Office: Eugene Office
County: Linn
Presiding Judge: Thomas M. Coffin
 
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 15, 2009 27 Featured Case ORDER and Findings & Recommendation: Order Granting Motion for Leave To File Second Amended Complaint 14 . Plaintiffs shall serve the second amended complaint on all defendants. Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand Action To Linn County Circu it Court 19 should be allowed to the extent the Clerk of the Court should remand this action to Linn County Circuit Court upon notice from plaintiffs that the Second Amended Complaint has been served on all defendants. All other plending motions should be denied as moot. Objections to the Findings and Recommendation are due by 7/2/2009. Signed on 6/15/09 by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. (ljb)
July 14, 2009 34 Featured Case ORDER: Adopting Findings and Recommendation 27 ; Granting Motion to Remand 19 to the extent that the Clerk of the Court will remand this action to Linn County Circuit Court upon notice from plaintiffs that the second amended complaint has been served on all defendants. All other pending motions are moot. Signed on 7/14/09 by U.S. District Judge Michael R. Hogan. (ljb)
September 18, 2009 42 Featured Case Findings & Recommendation: Motion for Attorney Fees 35 should be denied. Objections to the Findings and Recommendation are due by 10/15/2009. Signed on 9/18/09 by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. (ljb)
November 3, 2009 44 Featured Case ORDER: Adopting Judge Coffin's Findings and Recommendation 42 . Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees 35 is denied. Signed on 11/2/09 by U.S. District Judge Michael R. Hogan. (lae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Keith Goodridge Construction et al v. WYBS, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WYBS, Inc.
Represented By: Elisa J. Dozono
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Goodridge Construction
Represented By: Matthew P. Zanotelli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Goodridge
Represented By: Matthew P. Zanotelli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]