QVC, INC. v. MJC AMERICA, LTD.

Plaintiff: QVC, INC.
Defendant: MJC AMERICA, LTD.
 
Case Number: 2:2008cv03830
Filed: August 12, 2008
 
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Chester
Presiding Judge: BRUCE W. KAUFFMAN
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2012 102 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 10/22/2012. 10/23/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ems)
October 22, 2012 103 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION ORDER THAT JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF AND COUNTERCLAIM-DEFENDANT QVC, INC. AND AGAINST DEFENDANT AND COUNTERCLAIM-PLAINTIFF MJC AMERICA, LTD. D/B/A SOLEUS INTERNATIONAL, INC. AS OUTLINED HEREIN. THE CLERK OF C OURT SHALL ENTER JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF AND COUNTERCLAIM-DEFENDANT QVC, INC. AND AGAINST DEFENDANT AND COUNTERCLAIM-PLAINTIFF MJC AMERICA, LTD. D/B/A SOLEUS INTERNATIONAL, INC. IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,681,806.84. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Q VC MAY, ON OR BEFORE 11/13/2012, FILE A MOTION TO REVISE THE JUDGMENT TO INCLUDE ITS REASONABLE ATTORNEY'S FEES AND A CALCULATION OF ITS PREJUDGMENT INTEREST. IF QVC FILES SUCH A MOTION, DEFENDANT SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO SUCH MOTION ON OR BEFOR E 12/3/2012. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT SOLEUS SHALL ACCEPT FROM QVC RETURN OF THE UNSOLD AND UNSHIPPED HEATERS AND UNSHIPPED OTHER MERCHANDISE REMAINING IN QVC'S INVENTORY. IT IS STILL FURTHER ORDERED THAT QVC'S OBJECTION TO CERTAIN EXHIBITS OFFERED INTO EVIDENCE BY SOLEUS (DOC. NO. 99) IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 10/22/2012. 10/23/2012 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ems)
August 5, 2013 115 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 8/5/13. 8/5/13 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
August 5, 2013 116 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT MOTION TO REVISE JUDGMENT IS GRANTED AND COURTS ORDER OF 10/22/12 (DOC. 103) IS AMENDED TO INCLUDE AN AWARD OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS AND PREJUDGMENT INTEREST AS FOLLOWS: SOLEUS IS LIABLE TO QVC FOR $719,411.76 IN REAS ONABLE ATTORNEYS FEES PAID TO SAUL EWING, LLP. SOLEUS IS LIABLE TO QVC FOR $16,632.00 IN REASONABLE ATTORNEYS FEES PAID TO BROWN & GIDDING, P.C. SOLEUS IS LIABLE TO QVC FOR $157,811.99 IN COSTS AND EXPENSES PAID TO SAUL EWING, LLP. SOLEUS I S LIABLE TO QVC FOR $645.71 IN COSTS AND EXPENSES PAID TO BROWN & GIDDING, PC. SOLEUS IS LIABLE TO AVC FOR $415,486.57 IN PREJUDGMENT INTEREST FOR QVC'S HEATER RELATED DAMAGES AND SOLEUS IS LIABLE TO QVC FOR $43,783.21 IN PREJUDGM ENT INTEREST FOR QVC'S DAMAGES RELATED TO OTHER MERCHANDISE. AS AMENDED, JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR PLAINTIFFS AND COUNTERCLAIM-DEFENDANT QVC, INC AND AGAINST DEFENDANT COUNTERCLAIM PLAINTIFF MJC AMERICA, LTD. D/B/A SOLEUS, INTERNATIONAL, INC. IN THE AMOUT OF $3,035,578.08. ALL OTHER PROVISIONS IN THE COURTS ORDER AND JUDGMENT DATED 10/22/12 (DOC. 103) SHALL REMAIN AS ORIGINALLY STATED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 8/5/13. 8/5/13 ENTERED AND COPIES EMAILED.(rf, )
July 18, 2011 50 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 7/18/11. 7/18/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(fdc)
July 18, 2011 51 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT QVC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO COUNT V OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT, WHICH PERTAINS TO UNSOLD HEATERS, IS DENIED. QVC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO COUNTS VII, IX, AND XI OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAI NT IS GRANTED. JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF QVC AND AGAINST MJC AMERICA, LTD. D/B/A SOLEUS INTERNATIONAL, INC. IN THE AMOUNT OF $284,353.75 FOR QVC'S DAMAGES FOR SHIPPED CUSTOMER RETURN MERCHANDISE. JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF QVC AN D AGAINST MJC AMERICA, LTD. D/B/A SOLEUS INTERNATIONAL, INC. FOR PREJUDGEMENT INTEREST FOR SHIPPED CUSTOMER RETURN MERCHANDISE IN THE AMOUNT OF $55,667.34. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE CASE IS LISTED FOR TRIAL TO COMMENCE ON MONDAY, 10/3/11 AT 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 4A OF THE USDC FOR THE EDPA, 601 MARKET ST., PHILA. PA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 7/18/11. 7/19/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(fdc)
July 18, 2011 52 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 7/18/11. 7/19/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(fdc)
July 18, 2011 53 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF AND COUNTERCLAIM-DEFENDANT QVC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO COUNT II OF THE AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM OF DEFENDANT AND COUNTERCLAIM-PLAINTIFF MJC AMERICA, LTD., D/B/A SOLEUS INTERNATIONAL, INC. IS GRANTED. J UDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF QVC, INC. AND AGAINST MJC AMERICA, D/B/A SOLEUS INTERNATIONAL, INC. AS TO COUNT II OF DEFENDANT'S AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 7/18/11. 7/19/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(fdc)
August 24, 2011 57 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. FELIPE RESTREPO FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; AND THE TRIAL PRESENTLY SCHEDULED FOR MONDAY, 10/3/11 AT 10:00 AM IS RESCHEDULED TO MONDAY, 11/14/11 AT 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 4A BEFORE HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL JR. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 8/24/11. 8/25/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(fdc)
January 4, 2012 73 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 1/4/12. 1/4/12 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(fdc)
January 4, 2012 74 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT QVC'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN OPINION TESTIMONY OF SOLEUS' EXPERT HARRY EHRLICH IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 1/4/12. 1/4/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(fdc)
January 6, 2012 75 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 1/6/12. 1/6/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(fdc)
January 6, 2012 76 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT SOLEUS' MOTION IN LIMINE CONCERNING EVIDENCE OF CUSTOMER COMPLAINTS IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. SIGNED BY HONORABLE THOMAS N. ONEILL, JR ON 1/6/12. 1/6/12 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(fdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: QVC, INC. v. MJC AMERICA, LTD.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QVC, INC.
Represented By: NATHANIEL METZ
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJC AMERICA, LTD.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]