ATLANTIC PIER ASSOCIATES, LLC v. BOARDAKAN RESTAURANT PARTNERS, L.P. et al

Plaintiff: ATLANTIC PIER ASSOCIATES, LLC
Defendant: BOARDAKAN RESTAURANT PARTNERS, L.P. and OCEANENTAL PARTNERS, L.P.
 
Case Number: 2:2008cv04564
Filed: September 18, 2008
 
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C. ROBRENO
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 30, 2010 101 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 8/30/10. 8/31/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(ti, )
August 30, 2010 102 Featured Case ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ADD THE TAUBMAN COMPANY, LLC AS AN ADDITIONAL PARTY PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 15(a)(2) AND 15(c) 90 , IS GRANTED, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE M. FAITH ANGELL ON 8/30/10. 8/31/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(ti, )
July 29, 2011 139 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINIONSIGNED BY HONORABLE LOUIS H. POLLAK ON 7/27/11. 7/29/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
July 29, 2011 140 Featured Case ORDER THAT, FOR THE REASONS DISCUSSED IN THE ACCOMPANYING OPINION, THE MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED AND THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED AS TO THOSE DEFENDANTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LOUIS H. POLLAK ON 7/28/11. 7/29/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
August 21, 2009 54 Featured Case MEMORANDUM THAT PENDING BEFORE THE COURT ARE FOUR MOTIONS TO DISMISS THE FRAUD, NEGLIGENT MISREPRESENTATION, CIVIL CONSPIRACY, AND PROMISSORY ESTOPPEL CLAIMS FILED BY BOARDAKAN RESTAURANT, LLC AND OCEANENTAL RESTAURANT, LLC, THE OPERATORS OF TWO STEV EN STARR RESTAURANTS, BUDDAKAN AND CONTINENTAL, RESPECTIVELY (HEREINAFTER "STARR PLAINTIFFS"). THE MOTIONS ARE FILED BY THE FOLLOWING DEFENDANTS, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/20/09. 8/21/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ti, )
August 21, 2009 55 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE FOLLOWING MOTIONS TO DISMISS ARE DENIED WITH PREJUDICE 20 ; 22 ; AND 41 . SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 8/20/09. 8/21/09 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
August 2, 2010 98 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION SIGNED BY HONORABLE LOUIS H. POLLAK ON 8/2/10. 8/3/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )
August 2, 2010 99 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANTS TAUBMAN CENTERS, INC., TAUBMAN REALTY GROUP LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, AND TRG THE PIER, LLC FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SURREPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER RULE 12(b)(2) 89 , IS GRANTED; AND THE MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER RULE 12(b)(2) FILED BY DEFENDANTS TCI, TRG, AND TRG PIER 21 , IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE LOUIS H. POLLAK ON 8/2/10. 8/3/10 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: ATLANTIC PIER ASSOCIATES, LLC v. BOARDAKAN RESTAURANT PARTNERS, L.P. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATLANTIC PIER ASSOCIATES, LLC
Represented By: JEFFREY MEYERS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOARDAKAN RESTAURANT PARTNERS, L.P.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEANENTAL PARTNERS, L.P.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]