RUDOVSKY et al v. WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: DAVID RUDOVSKY and LEONARD SOSNOV
Defendant: WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION, WEST SERVICES INC. and THOMPSON LEGAL AND REGULATORY INC.
 
Case Number: 2:2009cv00727
Filed: February 19, 2009
 
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Assault Libel & Slander Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: JOHN P. FULLAM
 
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
May 12, 2011 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re 112 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by DAVID RUDOVSKY, LEONARD SOSNOV, 110 Notice of Appeal filed by THOMPSON LEGAL AND REGULATORY INC., WEST SERVICES INC., WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION. USCA Case Number 11-2256 (ems)
May 9, 2011 113 Clerk's Notice to USCA re 112 Notice of Cross Appeal : (jl, )
May 9, 2011 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455 receipt number PPEO42816 re 112 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by DAVID RUDOVSKY, LEONARD SOSNOV (jl, )
May 9, 2011 112 NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL by DAVID RUDOVSKY, LEONARD SOSNOV, Certificate of Service. (CHARLSON, NOAH) Modified on 5/10/2011 (nd, ).
April 22, 2011 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re 110 Notice of Appeal filed by THOMPSON LEGAL AND REGULATORY INC., WEST SERVICES INC., WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION. USCA Case Number 11-2034 (jl, )
April 20, 2011 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455 receipt number PPEO41821 re 110 Notice of Appeal filed by THOMPSON LEGAL AND REGULATORY INC., WEST SERVICES INC., WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION (jl, )
April 19, 2011 111 Clerk's Notice to USCA re 110 Notice of Appeal : (jl, )
April 19, 2011 110 NOTICE OF APPEAL by THOMPSON LEGAL AND REGULATORY INC., WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION, WEST SERVICES INC.. Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk and (BORGER, MATTHEW) Modified on 4/20/2011 (nd, ).
April 13, 2011 109 Featured Case ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW IS DENIED. DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL IS DENIED. DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION IS DISMISSED AS MOOT. JUDGMENT IS HEREBY ENTERED IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF DAVID RUDOVSKY AND AGAINST THE DEFENDANTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $200,000.00. JUDGMENT IS HEREBY ENTERED IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF LEONARD SOSNOV AND AGAINST THE DEFENDANTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $200,000.00; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM ON 4/13/11. 4/13/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, )
April 13, 2011 108 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION WILL BE DISMISSED AS MOOT; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM ON 4/13/11. 4/13/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, )
April 12, 2011 107 MOTION for Reconsideration or, Alternatively, for Certification for Interlocutory Appeal filed by THOMPSON LEGAL AND REGULATORY INC., WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION, WEST SERVICES INC..Brief, Certificate of Service.(BORGER, MATTHEW)
April 8, 2011 106 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by DAVID RUDOVSKY, LEONARD SOSNOV.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(CHARLSON, NOAH)
March 30, 2011 105 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW IS DENIED. IF, WITHIN 10 DAYS, PLAINTIFFS ACCEPT A REMITTITUR OF THE VERDICT TO A TOTAL OF $200,000 PER PLAINTIFF ($400,000 IN TOTAL), DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL WILL ALSO BE DENIED. ABSENT ACCEPTANCE OF THE REMITTITUR HEREBY ORDERED, DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL WILL BE GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM ON 3/30/11. 3/30/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, )
March 30, 2011 104 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW IS DENIED. IF, WITHIN 10 DAYS, PLAINTIFFS ACCEPT A REMITTITUR OF THE VERDICT TO A TOTAL OF $200,000 PER PLAINTIFF ($400,000 IN TOTAL), DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL WILL ALSO BE DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM ON 3/30/11. 3/30/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, )
March 17, 2011 103 Statement - Letter to Judge Fullam, dated March 17, 2011 by DAVID RUDOVSKY, LEONARD SOSNOV. (CHARLSON, NOAH)
March 16, 2011 102 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM: Motion Hearing held on 3/16/11 re 92 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or, in the alternative, for a new trial filed by THOMPSON LEGAL AND REGULATORY INC., WEST SERVICES INC., WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION (jl, )
February 25, 2011 101 Memorandum Reply Brief In Further Support of Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law re 92 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or, in the alternative, for a new trial filed by THOMPSON LEGAL AND REGULATORY INC., WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION, WEST SERVICES INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(BORGER, MATTHEW)
February 17, 2011 100 NOTICE by DAVID RUDOVSKY, LEONARD SOSNOV re 97 Memorandum Notice of Amendment to Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service. (CHARLSON, NOAH) Modified on 2/18/2011 (nd, ).
February 15, 2011 99 NOTICE of Hearing: ORAL ARGUMENT, re: RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A NEW TRIAL SET FOR 3/16/2011, 01:30 P.M. IN COURTROOM 15-A BEFORE THE HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM. (rbh)
February 15, 2011 98 Letter Request for Oral Argument February 15, 2011 Letter to Judge Fullam by THOMPSON LEGAL AND REGULATORY INC., WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION, WEST SERVICES INC.. (BORGER, MATTHEW) Modified on 2/16/2011 (nd, ).
February 10, 2011 97 Memorandum of Law in Opposition re 92 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or, in the alternative, for a new trial filed by DAVID RUDOVSKY, LEONARD SOSNOV. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(CHARLSON, NOAH)
February 7, 2011 96 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER CONCERNING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM ON 2/7/11. 2/8/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(ti, )
February 4, 2011 95 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER by THOMPSON LEGAL AND REGULATORY INC., WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION, WEST SERVICES INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(BORGER, MATTHEW) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO CLERK/JUDGE FOR APRPOVAL) Modified on 2/7/2011 (nd, ).
January 26, 2011 94 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE AND SERVE THEIR OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR A NEW TRIAL ON OR BEFORE 2/25/11; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM ON 1/26/11. 1/26/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, )
January 18, 2011 93 NOTICE of Hearing: HEARING, re: REQUEST FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF RESCHEDULED FOR 2/10/2011, 02:00 P.M. IN COURTROOM 15-A BEFORE THE HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM.(rbh)
January 13, 2011 92 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law or, in the alternative, for a new trial filed by THOMPSON LEGAL AND REGULATORY INC., WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION, WEST SERVICES INC..Memorandum, Declaration. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 2 Memorandum of Law, # 3 Zeisler declaration, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Exhibit K, # 15 Exhibit L)(BORGER, MATTHEW)
December 30, 2010 91 Letter from RICHARD BAZELON TO JUDGE FULLAM RE: CERTAIN STATEMENTS. (jl, )
December 28, 2010 90 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re 87 Transcript - PDF, 89 Transcript - PDF, 86 Transcript - PDF, 88 Transcript - PDF, 12/29/2010 Entered and Copies Emailed and Mailed.. (tomg, )
December 28, 2010 89 TRANSCRIPT of Trial held on 12/16/2010, before Judge Honorable John P. Fullam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Dennis Taylor. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 1/18/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/25/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/25/2011. (tomg, )
December 28, 2010 88 TRANSCRIPT of Trial held on 12/15/2010, before Judge Honorable John P. Fullam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Dennis Taylor. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 1/18/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/25/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/25/2011. (tomg, )
December 28, 2010 87 TRANSCRIPT of Trial held on 12/14/2010, before Judge Honorable John P. Fullam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Dennis Taylor. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 1/18/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/25/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/25/2011. (tomg, )
December 28, 2010 86 TRANSCRIPT of Trial held on 12/13/2010, before Judge Honorable John P. Fullam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Dennis Taylor. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 1/18/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/25/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/25/2011. (tomg, )
December 21, 2010 85 NOTICE of Hearing: HEARING, re: REQUEST FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF SET FOR 1/31/2011, 10:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 15-A BEFORE THE HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM.(rbh)
December 17, 2010 84 JUDGMENT ORDER THAT JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF DAVID RUDOVSKY AND LEONARD SOSNOV INDIVIDUALLY AND AGAINST DEFENDANTS WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION, WEST SERVICES INC. AND THOMPSON LEGAL REGULATRORY INC IN THE AMOUNT OF 2,590.000,00.; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM ON 12/16/10. 12/17/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) Modified on 12/17/2010 (jl, ). Modified on 12/17/2010 (jl, ).
December 17, 2010 83 VERDICT FORM(jl, )
December 17, 2010 82 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PA BE AND HE IS HEREBY DIRECTED TO FURNISH LUNCH FOR JURORS ENGAGED IN THE ABOVE ENTITLED CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM ON 12/16/10. 12/17/10 ENTERED.(jl, )
December 17, 2010 81 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM: Jury Trial day 4 completed on 12/16/10 (jl, )
December 16, 2010 80 Proposed Jury Instructions by DAVID RUDOVSKY, LEONARD SOSNOV. Certificate of Service (CHARLSON, NOAH)
December 16, 2010 79 Proposed Verdict Sheet by THOMPSON LEGAL AND REGULATORY INC., WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION, WEST SERVICES INC... (BORGER, MATTHEW)
December 16, 2010 78 Proposed Jury Instructions by THOMPSON LEGAL AND REGULATORY INC., WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION, WEST SERVICES INC.. (BORGER, MATTHEW)
December 15, 2010 77 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM: Jury Trial day 3 held on 12/15/10. (jl, )
December 15, 2010 76 Proposed Jury Instructions by THOMPSON LEGAL AND REGULATORY INC., WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION, WEST SERVICES INC.. (BORGER, MATTHEW)
December 15, 2010 75 Supplemental Proposed Jury Instructions by DAVID RUDOVSKY, LEONARD SOSNOV, Certificate of Service. (CHARLSON, NOAH) Modified on 12/15/2010 (nd).
December 15, 2010 74 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM: Jury Trial day 2 held on 12/14/10. (jl, )
December 15, 2010 73 Proposed Verdict Sheet by DAVID RUDOVSKY, LEONARD SOSNOV.. (CHARLSON, NOAH)
December 14, 2010 72 Proposed Jury Instructions by DAVID RUDOVSKY, LEONARD SOSNOV. Certificate of Service (CHARLSON, NOAH)
December 14, 2010 71 Proposed Verdict Sheet by THOMPSON LEGAL AND REGULATORY INC., WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION, WEST SERVICES INC... (BORGER, MATTHEW)
December 14, 2010 70 Proposed Jury Instructions by THOMPSON LEGAL AND REGULATORY INC., WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION, WEST SERVICES INC.. (BORGER, MATTHEW)
December 13, 2010 69 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM: Jury Trial held on 12/13/2010 Court Reporter: ROSALIND BURTON-HOOP. (kp, )
December 8, 2010 68 DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THAT PORTION OF THE COURT'S 7/15/10 ORDER ADDRESSING DEFAMATION PER SE.(jl, )
December 8, 2010 67 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THAT PORTION OF THE COURT'S 7/15/10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ADDRESSING DEFAMATION PER SE NUNC TO 7/29/10 IS GRANTED. DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM ON 12/8/10. 12/8/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, )
September 17, 2010 66 MOTION for Leave to File Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration of That Portion of the Court's July 15, 2010 Order Addressing Defamation Per Se Nunc Pro Tunc filed by THOMPSON LEGAL AND REGULATORY INC., WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION, WEST SERVICES INC..Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service.(BORGER, MATTHEW)
September 13, 2010 65 Featured Case ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE/MOTION FOR SANCTIONS IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM ON 9/13/10.9/13/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, )
August 18, 2010 64 REPLY to Response to Motion re 62 Memorandum of Law in Support of MOTION for Reconsideration re 59 Memorandum and/or Opinion,Memorandum of Law in Support of MOTION for Reconsideration re 59 Memorandum and/or Opinion, filed by THOMPSON LEGAL AND REGULATORY INC., WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION, WEST SERVICES INC.. (BORGER, MATTHEW)
August 12, 2010 63 RESPONSE to Motion re 62 Memorandum of Law in Support of MOTION for Reconsideration re 59 Memorandum and/or Opinion,Memorandum of Law in Support of MOTION for Reconsideration re 59 Memorandum and/or Opinion, filed by DAVID RUDOVSKY, LEONARD SOSNOV. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(CHARLSON, NOAH)
July 29, 2010 62 Memorandum of Law in Support of MOTION for Reconsideration re 59 Memorandum and/or Opinion, filed by THOMPSON LEGAL AND REGULATORY INC., WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION, WEST SERVICES INC..Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service. (BORGER, MATTHEW) Modified on 7/30/2010 (nd).
July 16, 2010 61 NOTICE of Hearing: JURY TRIAL RESCHEDULED FOR 12/13/2010, 10:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 15-A BEFORE THE HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM. (rbh)
July 15, 2010 60 Featured Case ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. COUNTS I AND II OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM ON 7/15/10. 7/15/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, )
July 15, 2010 59 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. COUNTS I AND II OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM ON 7/15/10. 7/15/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, )
June 2, 2010 58 Declaration re 52 MOTION for Summary Judgment Zeisler Declaration Exhibit C REDACTED by THOMPSON LEGAL AND REGULATORY INC., WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION, WEST SERVICES INC.. (BORGER, MATTHEW)
June 2, 2010 57 Featured Case ORDER THAT EXHIBIT C (DOCUMENT 52-5) TO THE DECLARATION OF AARON ZEISLER IS STRICKEN FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.1.3. THE CLERK IS DIRECTED TO REMOVE THE EXHIBIT FROM THE ELECTRONIC FILING SYSTEM AND TO RETURN THE ORIGINAL FILED PAPER COPY, IF ANY, TO COUNSEL FOR THE DEFENDANTS; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM ON 6/2/10. 6/2/10 ENTERED AND E-MAILED. (EXHIBIT MAILED TO COUNSEL)(jl, )
May 13, 2010 56 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM: Motion Hearing held on 5/13/10 re 52 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by THOMPSON LEGAL AND REGULATORY INC., WEST SERVICES INC., WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION Court Reporter: INNA GOLDSHETYN. (kp, )
May 12, 2010 55 RESPONSE in Opposition re 52 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DAVID RUDOVSKY, LEONARD SOSNOV. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Noah Charlson, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration, # 4 Exhibit B to Declaration, # 5 Exhibit C to Declaration, # 6 Exhibit D to Declaration, # 7 Exhibit E to Declaration, # 8 Exhibit F to Declaration, # 9 Exhibit G to Declaration, # 10 Exhibit H to Declaration, # 11 Exhibit I to Declaration, # 12 Exhibit J to Declaration, # 13 Exhibit K to Declaration, # 14 Exhibit L to Declaration, # 15 Exhibit M to Declaration, # 16 Exhibit N to Declaration, # 17 Exhibit O to Declaration, # 18 Exhibit P to Declaration)(CHARLSON, NOAH)
May 12, 2010 54 MOTION in Limine /Motion for Sanctions filed by DAVID RUDOVSKY, LEONARD SOSNOV.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Memorandum, # 3 Exhibit 1 and 2, # 4 Exhibit 3 - 6)(CHARLSON, NOAH)
May 5, 2010 53 NOTICE of Hearing: ORAL ARGUMENT, re: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SET FOR 5/13/2010, 01:30 P.M. IN COURTROOM 15-A BEFORE THE HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM.(rbh)
April 21, 2010 52 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by THOMPSON LEGAL AND REGULATORY INC., WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION, WEST SERVICES INC..Memorandum, Declarations, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jean Maess, # 2 Declaration of Aaron Zeisler, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L)(BORGER, MATTHEW)
March 8, 2010 51 NOTICE of Hearing: JURY TRIAL RESCHEDULED FOR 5/17/2010, 10:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 15-A BEFORE THE HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM. (rbh)
September 22, 2009 50 NOTICE of Hearing: JURY TRIAL SET FOR 3/29/2010, 10:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 15-A BEFORE THE HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM. (rbh)
June 18, 2009 49 ANSWER to 5 Amended Complaint by WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION, WEST SERVICES INC., THOMPSON LEGAL AND REGULATORY INC. with Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service. (BORGER, MATTHEW) Modified on 6/19/2009 (nd).
June 4, 2009 48 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM ON 6/4/09. 6/5/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, )
June 4, 2009 47 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS WILL BE DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM ON 6/4/09. 6/5/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, )
May 11, 2009 46 DEFENDANTS REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS. (jl, )
May 11, 2009 45 Featured Case ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM ON 5/11/09.5/11/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, )
May 6, 2009 44 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum Of Law In Further Support Of Motion To Dismiss filed by WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION, WEST SERVICES INC., THOMPSON LEGAL AND REGULATORY INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Defendants' Reply Memorandum Of Law In Further Support Of Their Motion To Dismiss, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(BORGER, MATTHEW)
May 5, 2009 43 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re 42 Transcript - PDF, 5/5/09 Entered and Copies Emailed and Mailed.. (jl, )
May 5, 2009 42 TRANSCRIPT of PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING held on 4/14/09, before Judge FULLAM. Court Reporter/Transcriber DENNIS TAYLOR. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/26/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/5/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/3/2009. (jl, )
May 4, 2009 41 Memorandum in Opposition re 22 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by DAVID RUDOVSKY, LEONARD SOSNOV. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-G)(CHARLSON, NOAH)
April 27, 2009 40 DEFENDANTS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. (jl, )
April 27, 2009 39 Featured Case ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM ON 4/20/09.4/27/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, )
April 23, 2009 38 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re 37 Transcript - PDF, 4/23/09 Entered and Copies Emailed and Mailed. (ah)
April 23, 2009 37 TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 4/14/09, before Judge John P. Fullam. Court Reporter/Transcriber ESR. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/14/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/26/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/22/2009. (ah)
April 23, 2009 36 Featured Case ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' EMERGENCY MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING IS DISMISSED AS MOOT; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM ON 4/23/09.4/23/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, )
April 23, 2009 35 Featured Case ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IS DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM ON 4/23/09. 4/23/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, )
April 23, 2009 34 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANTS MAY, IN THEIR OWN SELF-INTEREST, DECIDE THAT FURTHER INTERIM CORRECTIVE MEASURES SHOULD BE TAKEN, IN ORDER TO MINIMIZE PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS FOR DAMAGES. BUT I AM NOT PERSUADED THAT THE SITUATION IS SUFFICIENTLY CLEAR AS TO WARRENT FURTHER PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM ON 4/23/09. 4/23/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, )
April 20, 2009 33 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE PARTIES ON OR BEFORE 5/4/09 PLAINTIFFS DAVID RUDOVSKY AND LEONARD SOSNOV SHALL FILE AND SERVE THEIR RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS THE AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM ON 4/20/09. 4/20/09 ENTERED AND E-MAILED AND FAXED.(jl, )
April 14, 2009 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM: Motion Hearing held on 4/14/09 re 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by DAVID RUDOVSKY, LEONARD SOSNOV (jl, )
April 14, 2009 31 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION, WEST SERVICES INC., THOMPSON LEGAL AND REGULATORY INC..Certificate of Service.(BORGER, MATTHEW)
April 10, 2009 30 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction re 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION, WEST SERVICES INC., THOMPSON LEGAL AND REGULATORY INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jean Maess, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I)(BORGER, MATTHEW)
April 10, 2009 29 Memorandum re 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Supplemental Memorandum filed by DAVID RUDOVSKY, LEONARD SOSNOV. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(SKOLNIK, MATTHEW)
April 6, 2009 28 Declaration of David Rudovsky (Amended) by DAVID RUDOVSKY, LEONARD SOSNOV. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(BAZELON, RICHARD)
April 6, 2009 27 Declaration of David Rudovsky (Amended) by DAVID RUDOVSKY, LEONARD SOSNOV. (BAZELON, RICHARD)
April 6, 2009 26 Memorandum re 21 Emergency MOTION to Compel Production of Documents for Preliminary Injunction Hearing Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Compel Document Production filed by WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION, WEST SERVICES INC., THOMPSON LEGAL AND REGULATORY INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(BORGER, MATTHEW)
April 6, 2009 25 Featured Case ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS EMERGENCY MOTION FOR ADJOURNMENT OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING CURRENTLY SET FOR 4/9/09 IS DISMISSED AS MOOT; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM ON 4/6/09.4/6/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(jl, )
April 3, 2009 24 Declaration of James Rittinger in Support of 22 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION, WEST SERVICES INC., THOMPSON LEGAL AND REGULATORY INC..Declaration. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(BORGER, MATTHEW) Modified on 4/6/2009 (fh)
April 3, 2009 23 Memorandum of Law in Support of 22 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION, WEST SERVICES INC., THOMPSON LEGAL AND REGULATORY INC.(BORGER, MATTHEW) Modified on 4/6/2009 (fh)
April 3, 2009 22 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION, WEST SERVICES INC., THOMPSON LEGAL AND REGULATORY INC..Certificate of Service.(BORGER, MATTHEW)
April 3, 2009 21 Emergency MOTION to Compel Production of Documents for Preliminary Injunction Hearing filed by DAVID RUDOVSKY, LEONARD SOSNOV.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Certificate of Service)(BAZELON, RICHARD)
April 2, 2009 20 Emergency MOTION to Continue For Adjournment of Preliminary Injunction Hearing filed by WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION, WEST SERVICES INC., THOMPSON LEGAL AND REGULATORY INC... (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(BORGER, MATTHEW)
April 2, 2009 19 THE UNDERSIGNED HEREBY ACKOWLEDGES RECEIPT OF DOCUMENT NOS. 4-9 AND 10-2 (Exhibit A) IN THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE; ETC. (jl, )
April 2, 2009 18 EXHIBIT 2 to Rudovsky Declaration (Plaintiff's Preliminary Injunction Motion) by DAVID RUDOVSKY, LEONARD SOSNOV.. (SKOLNIK, MATTHEW)
April 2, 2009 17 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE FOLLOWING DOCUEMENTS ARE STRICKEN FOR A FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.1.3: EXHIBIT 2 TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (DOCKET ENTRY NO. 4-9); AND EXHIBIT A TO DEFENDANT'S EMERGENCY MOTION FOR ADJOURNMENT OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING CURRENTLY SET FOR 4/9/09 (DOCKET ENTRY NO. 10-2). THE CLERK IS DIRECTED TO REMOVE THE EXHIBITS FROM THE ELECTRONIC FILING SYSTEM AND TO RETURN THE ORIGINAL FILED PAPER COPIES, IF ANY, TO COUNSEL; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM ON 4/2/09. 4/2/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(jl, )
April 2, 2009 16 Statement Rule 7.1 Statement by WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION, WEST SERVICES INC., THOMPSON LEGAL AND REGULATORY INC.. (BORGER, MATTHEW)
April 1, 2009 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. MOTION HEARING SET FOR 4/14/2009 01:45 PM BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM. (jl, )
April 1, 2009 15 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR ADJOURNMENT OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING CURRENTLY SET FOR 4/9/09 OF DEFENDANTS IS GRANTED. THE HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IS HEREBY RESCHEDULED TO 4/14/09 AT 1:45 P.M.; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM ON 4/1/09.4/1/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(jl, )
April 1, 2009 14 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF JAMES RITTINGER TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE FOR THE DEFENDANTS IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM ON 3/31/09. 4/1/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(jl, )
April 1, 2009 13 Featured Case ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF AARON ZEISLER TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE FOR THE DEFENDANTS IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM ON 3/31/09. 4/1/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(jl, )
March 30, 2009 12 APPLICATION by WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION, WEST SERVICES INC., THOMPSON LEGAL AND REGULATORY INC. FOR AARON ZEISLER TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (FEE PAID) (jl, )
March 30, 2009 11 APPLICATION by WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION, WEST SERVICES INC., THOMPSON LEGAL AND REGULATORY INC. FOR JAMES RITTINGER TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, STATEMENT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (FEE PAID) (jl, )
March 30, 2009 10 Emergency MOTION For Adjournment of Preliminary Injunction Hearing re 8 Notice of Hearing filed by WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION, WEST SERVICES INC., THOMPSON LEGAL AND REGULATORY INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, (STRICKEN PER ORDER OF 4/2/09) # 2 Exhibit B)(BORGER, MATTHEW) Modified on 4/2/2009 (jl, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/2/2009: # 3 HARD COPY TO EXHIBIT A) (jl, ).
March 26, 2009 9 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW J. BORGER on behalf of WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION, WEST SERVICES INC., THOMPSON LEGAL AND REGULATORY INC. (BORGER, MATTHEW)
March 26, 2009 8 NOTICE of Hearing: HEARING, re: PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SET FOR 4/9/2009, 10:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 15-A BEFORE THE HONORABLE JOHN P. FULLAM. (rbh)
March 25, 2009 7 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW R. SKOLNIK on behalf of DAVID RUDOVSKY, LEONARD SOSNOV with Certificate of Service(SKOLNIK, MATTHEW)
March 25, 2009 6 NOTICE of Appearance by NOAH H. CHARLSON on behalf of DAVID RUDOVSKY, LEONARD SOSNOV with Certificate of Service(CHARLSON, NOAH)
March 24, 2009 AMENDED Summons Issued as to WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION, WEST SERVICES INC., THOMPSON LEGAL AND REGULATORY INC.. Forwarded To: RICHARD BAZELON on 3/25/09 (jl, )
March 24, 2009 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION, WEST SERVICES INC., THOMPSON LEGAL AND REGULATORY INC., filed by DAVID RUDOVSKY, LEONARD SOSNOV, JURY DEMAND, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(jl, )
March 24, 2009 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by DAVID RUDOVSKY, LEONARD SOSNOV.Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Memorandum, # 3 Exhibit A to Memorandum, # 4 Exhibit B to Memorandum, # 5 Exhibit C to Memorandum, # 6 Declaration of Rudovsky, # 7 Exhibit 1 to Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 2 to Declaration,(STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED 4/2/09) # 9 Exhibit 3 to Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 4 to Declaration)(BAZELON, RICHARD) Modified on 4/2/2009 (jl, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/2/2009: # 11 HARD COPY EXHIBIT 2) (jl, ).
March 17, 2009 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DAVID RUDOVSKY, LEONARD SOSNOV. WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION waiver sent on 3/3/2009, answer due 6/1/2009; WEST SERVICES INC. waiver sent on 3/3/2009, answer due 6/1/2009; THOMPSON LEGAL AND REGULATORY INC. waiver sent on 3/3/2009, answer due 6/1/2009. (stb, )
March 11, 2009 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DAVID RUDOVSKY, LEONARD SOSNOV re: CLIFF RICHWAY served Summons and Complaint upon WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION, WEST SERVICES INC. by PERSONAL SERVICE. WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION served on 3/4/2009, answer due 3/24/2009; WEST SERVICES INC. served on 3/4/2009, answer due 3/24/2009. (jl, )
February 19, 2009 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by DAVID RUDOVSKY, LEONARD SOSNOV. (ks, )
February 19, 2009 3 Summonses Issued as to WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION, WEST SERVICES INC., THOMPSON LEGAL AND REGULATORY INC.. Forwarded To: Counsel on 2/20/09 (ks, ) Modified on 2/20/2009 (ks, ).
February 19, 2009 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 955202.), filed by DAVID RUDOVSKY, LEONARD SOSNOV.(ks, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: RUDOVSKY et al v. WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID RUDOVSKY
Represented By: RICHARD L. BAZELON
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEONARD SOSNOV
Represented By: RICHARD L. BAZELON
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEST PUBLISHING CORPORATION
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEST SERVICES INC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMPSON LEGAL AND REGULATORY INC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]