HARRIS et al v. WINFREY et al Featured Case

Author Charles Harris files a copyright infringement lawsuit against Oprah Winfrey, accusing her of plagiarism for a book

Plaintiff: CHARLES HARRIS and UNIQUE PRODUCTS AND SERVICES
Defendant: OPRAH WINFREY and THE OPRAH WINFREY SHOW
Case Number: 2:2010cv05655
Filed: October 26, 2010
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: JAN E. DUBOIS
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2011 19 Featured Case ORDER THAT PLFFS' ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW IS DENIED AS MOOT.SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 3/18/11. 3/21/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
March 18, 2011 18 Featured Case ORDER THAT DEFTS' MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED & PLFFS' COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; DEFTS' MOTION FOR RULE 11 SANCTIONS IS DENIED; & THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THE CASE CLOSED.SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 3/18/11. 3/21/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
March 18, 2011 17 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 3/18/11. 3/21/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
February 18, 2011 16 REPLY to deft's response and opposition to plffs' attorney's motion to withdraw, filed by JAMES LEE, ESQ. on behalf of PLFFS CHARLES HARRIS, UNIQUE PRODUCTS AND SERVICES. (kw, )
February 14, 2011 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re 14 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by THE OPRAH WINFREY SHOW, OPRAH WINFREY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(BABCOCK, CHARLES)
February 2, 2011 14 MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY FOR PLFFS CHARLES HARRIS & UNIQUE PRODUCTS AND SERVICES, MEMORANDUM, FILED BY JAMES LEE, ESQ.(kw, )
December 23, 2010 13 RESPONSE to Defendants' MOTION FOR RULE 11 SANCTIONS, Affidavit filed by CHARLES HARRIS, UNIQUE PRODUCTS AND SERVICES. (ti, )
December 20, 2010 12 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 filed by THE OPRAH WINFREY SHOW, OPRAH WINFREY.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A-1, # 3 Exhibit A-2, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C)(HANGLEY, WILLIAM)
December 20, 2010 11 Memorandum in Support re 4 MOTION to Dismiss (Supplement) filed by THE OPRAH WINFREY SHOW, OPRAH WINFREY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(HANGLEY, WILLIAM)
December 13, 2010 10 RESPONSE to defts' motion to dismiss, filed by PLFFS CHARLES HARRIS, UNIQUE PRODUCTS AND SERVICES. (kw, ) (kw, ).
December 7, 2010 9 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by THE OPRAH WINFREY SHOW.(HANGLEY, WILLIAM)
December 1, 2010 8 Featured Case ORDER THAT ATTORNEY NANCY W. HAMILTON IS HEREBY ADMITTED TO THE COURT PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF THE OPRAH WINFREY SHOW AND OPRAH WINFREY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 12/1/2010. 12/2/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
December 1, 2010 7 Featured Case ORDER THAT ATTORNEY CHARLES L. BABCOCK IS HEREBY ADMITTED TO THE COURT PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF THE OPRAH WINFREY SHOW AND OPRAH WINFREY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 12/1/2010. 12/2/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, )
November 30, 2010 6 APPLICATION for admission of NANCY W. HAMILTON, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice, Statement, Certificate of Service, filed by DEFTS THE OPRAH WINFREY SHOW, OPRAH WINFREY. (filing fee paid on 11/30/10) (kw, )
November 30, 2010 5 APPLICATION for admission of CHARLES L. BABCOCK, ESQ. to appear pro hac vice, Statement, Certificate of Service, filed by DEFTS THE OPRAH WINFREY SHOW, OPRAH WINFREY. (filing fee paid on 11/30/10) (kw, )
November 29, 2010 4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by THE OPRAH WINFREY SHOW, OPRAH WINFREY.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Memorandum of Law, # 3 Exhibit 1)(HANGLEY, WILLIAM)
November 2, 2010 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1, filed by DEFT UNIQUE PRODUCTS AND SERVICES.(kw, )
October 26, 2010 2 Copy of Form to Register of Copyrights. (jwl, )
October 26, 2010 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CHARLES HARRIS, UNIQUE PRODUCTS AND SERVICES. (jwl, )
October 26, 2010 Summons Issued as to THE OPRAH WINFREY SHOW, OPRAH WINFREY. Two Forwarded To: Counsel on 10/26/10 (jwl, )
October 26, 2010 1 COMPLAINT against THE OPRAH WINFREY SHOW, OPRAH WINFREY ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 031690.), filed by CHARLES HARRIS, UNIQUE PRODUCTS AND SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2, # 2 Part 3, # 3 Part 4, # 4 Part 5, # 5 Part 6, # 6 Part 7, # 7 Part 8, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet)(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HARRIS et al v. WINFREY et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES HARRIS
Represented By: JAMES E. LEE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIQUE PRODUCTS AND SERVICES
Represented By: JAMES E. LEE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPRAH WINFREY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE OPRAH WINFREY SHOW
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]