COMMONWEALTH'S MOTION TO APPOINT NEW COUNSEL AGAINST OR DIRECTED TO DEFENDER ASSOCIATION OF PHILADELPHIA, RESPONDENT et al v. HARRIS

Defendant: FRANCIS BAUER HARRIS
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA
Movant: DEFENDER ASSOCIATION OF PHILADELPHIA
 
Case Number: 2:2013mc00062
Filed: March 20, 2013
 
Court: Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Office: Philadelphia Office
County: Philadelphia
Presiding Judge: CYNTHIA M. RUFE
 
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2013 42 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 8/22/2013. 8/23/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kk, )
August 23, 2013 43 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO REMAND IS DENIED. THE MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED AND THIS MATTER IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 8/22/2013. 8/23/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED(kk, )
October 3, 2013 47 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 10/2/2013. 10/3/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kk, )
October 3, 2013 48 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM OPINION THE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (DOC. NO.44) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 10/2/2013. 10/3/2013 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (kk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: COMMONWEALTH'S MOTION TO APPOINT NEW COUNSEL AGAINST OR DIRECTED TO DEFENDER ASSOCIATION OF PHILADELPHIA, RESPONDENT et al v. HARRIS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANCIS BAUER HARRIS
Represented By: PETER KONRAD WILLIAMS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. SCHMIDT
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: DEFENDER ASSOCIATION OF PHILADELPHIA
Represented By: JOSHUA M. SALZMAN
Represented By: PATRICK J. CAROME
Represented By: PAUL R.Q. WOLFSON
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]