Thrower v. USA et al

Plaintiff: William Thrower
Defendant: USA, Bureau of Prisons, Warden of USP McCreary, Warden of USP Lewisburg and EMS Medical Team
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv01663
Filed: September 2, 2011
 
Court: Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Outside State
Referring Judge: EC
Presiding Judge: Christopher C. Conner
 
Nature of Suit: Mandamus and Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2011 13 Featured Case ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Pltf's motions to proceed w/out full prepymt of fees & costs 7 & 10 GRANTED.; 2. Any & all claims involving events that took place while pltf was incarc @ USP McCreary... are SEVERED from this actio n & TRANSFERRED to USDC for Eastern Dist of Kentucky.; 3. Ct will RETAIN jurisdiction of claims that USP Lewisburg employees knowingly placed him in cell w/ dangerous inmate & that he rec'd negligent med care during incarc @ USP Lewisburg. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 10/19/11. (ki)
November 14, 2011 25 Featured Case ORDER denying pltf's motion for reconsideration 20 of ct's 10/19/11 order severing & transferring claims to USDC for Eastern Dist of KY 13 . (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 11/14/11. (ki)
August 24, 2012 72 Featured Case MEMORANDUM & ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Claims against "US Bureau of Prisons" & "Bureau of Prisons" DISMISSED...; 2. MTD or in alt MSJ 41 GRANTED IN PART & DENIED IN PART.; 3. MSJ 41 w/ re: Bivens failure to protect claim vs Warden USP Lewisburg & FTCA negligent med care claim vs EMS Med Team w/ Clrk of Ct directed to enter jdgmt in favor of these defts & against pltf.; 4. MSJ DENIED w/ re: FTCA negligent failure to protect claim vs US.; 5. MTD GRANTED w/ re: F TCA negligent failure to protect claim vs US - FTCA negligent failure to protect claim DISMISSED in its entirety.; 6. Clrk of Ct to TERMINATE USP Warden McCreary as deft as claim vs him was x-ferred to USDC East Dist of KY.; 7. Clrk of Ct directed to CLOSE case.; 8. Any appeal from this order DEEMED frivolous & not in good faith. (See memo & order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 08/23/12. (ki)
November 5, 2012 83 Featured Case ORDER denying pltf's motion for reconsiderations 76 & denying pltf's motion for ext of time 82 to file reply to defts' br in opp to same. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 11/05/12. (ki)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Thrower v. USA et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Thrower
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Prisons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden of USP McCreary
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden of USP Lewisburg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMS Medical Team
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]