Quelet v. Preston et al

Plaintiff: Jeffrey John Quelet
Defendant: Vernon Preston, Lisa Smith, Stephen Pfisterer, Deborah DeAngelo, Brendan Buckley, Hillside Pain Management, PC, Hanover Family Practice Associates and Hanover Rehabilitation Center
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv01914
Filed: September 25, 2012
 
Court: Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Outside State
Presiding Judge: Christopher C. Conner
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 16, 2014 125 Featured Case MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re: defts' MTDs 100 , 102 , 104 , 106 , 110 , & 112 . (See memo for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 1/16/14. (ki)
January 16, 2014 126 Featured Case ORDER (Memorandum 125 filed previously as separate docket entry) - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Defts' MTDs 100 , 102 , 104 , 106 , 110 & 112 are GRANTED.; 2. Action DISMISSED with prejudice & without costs.; 3. Clrk of Ct directed to CLOSE this case. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 1/16/14. (ki)
September 24, 2012 33 Featured Case MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 9/24/12. (mps, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 9/25/2012.]
May 31, 2013 91 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Motions to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction 21 , 23 & 26 & motion for leave to file supp'l response to defts' jurisdictional motions 31 DENIED as MOOT.; 2. Motions to dism iss of Smith, Preston & Hanover Family Practice Associates 67 & Pfisterer 64 are GRANTED w/ re: factual sufficiency of the complaint & DENIED in all other respects.; 3. Motion to dismiss of DeAngelo & Hillside Pain Management 56 is DENIED.; 4. M otion to dismiss of Hanover Rehab Center 45 is DENIED.; 5. Motions to strike of DeAngelo & Hillside Pain Management 62 & Hanover Rehab Center 59 are DENIED as MOOT.; 6. The complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice - Quelet is hereby GRANTED leave to file an amended complaint with 20 days of this order. (See memo & order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 5/31/13. (ki)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Quelet v. Preston et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey John Quelet
Represented By: John Richard Oare, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vernon Preston
Represented By: John C. Farrell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Smith
Represented By: John C. Farrell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Pfisterer
Represented By: David M. McGeady
Represented By: John C. Farrell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah DeAngelo
Represented By: Colleen A. Shutts
Represented By: Michael M. Badowski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brendan Buckley
Represented By: Kevin A Dunne
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillside Pain Management, PC
Represented By: Michael M. Badowski
Represented By: Colleen A. Shutts
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanover Family Practice Associates
Represented By: John C. Farrell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanover Rehabilitation Center
Represented By: Thomas M. Chairs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]