United States of America v. Fama

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: James J. Fama
Case Number: 1:2013cv00550
Filed: February 27, 2013
Court: Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Office: Harrisburg Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Christopher C. Conner
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 42:1471 Declaratory & Injunctive Relief - Foreclo
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 17, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & DEFAULT JUDGMENT granting pltf's motion for default jdgmt 8 , entering judgment in favor of pltf & against deft in amt of $100,991.79 plus interest..., foreclosing promissory note & mortgage btwn pltf & deft re: real property @ ; 430 Woodland Ave, Hawley, PA 18428 w/ no right of redemption..., directing that the real property be sold by USM... (see Paras 3a-d for specific instructions), directing USM to hold sale proceeds pending distribution per further order of court, not ing pltf to be pd amt due pursuant to distribution of sale proceeds, directing Clrk of Ct to deliver true copy of this order to USM, & noting court shall retain jurisdiction over matter... (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 7/17/13. (ki)
March 31, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's motion for confirmation of public sale 15 - It is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Public sale held 2/25/14 confirmed & interest of lien holders divested.; 2. USM directed to execute & deliver to Andrea Titue... good & sufficient deed... to premises sold @ 430 Woodland Ave, Hawley, PA 18428.; 3. Deed to be recorded by purchaser w/in 30 days... w/ purchaser solely responsible for pymt of all recording chgs & expenses.; 4. Jurisdiction retained... (See order for complete details.)Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 3/31/14. (ki)
May 21, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting motion 17 for distribution of proceeds from sale of real property@ 430 Woodland Ave., Hawley, PA 18428 & directing USM to distribute proceeds of sale in acc w/ sched of distribution (see Doc 17 ). (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 5/21/14. (ki)
May 8, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting plaintiff's motion for service by posting 4 . (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 5/8/13. (ki)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Fama
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Thomas I. Puleo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James J. Fama
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]