Avco Corporation v. Precision Airmotive LLC

Plaintiff: Avco Corporation
Defendant: Precision Airmotive LLC
Case Number: 4:2012cv01313
Filed: July 6, 2012
Court: Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Office: Williamsport Office
County: Lycoming
Presiding Judge: Christopher C. Conner
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 3, 2015 145 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry).Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 2/3/15. (km)
February 3, 2015 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: In accordance with the MEMORANDUM filed previously as separate docket entry no. 145, IT IS ORDERED THAT: The Motion for a Preliminary Injunction 101 filed by the Defendant Turn and Bank Holdings, Inc. is DENIED. Defendant's Renewed Motion for a Preliminary Injunction 111 is DENIED as moot. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 2/3/15. (km)
November 19, 2012 60 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying deft Precision's motion for preliminary injunction 18 . (See memo & order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 11/19/12. (ki)
May 10, 2013 69 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: AVCOs motion to strike Precisions answer and counterclaims (Sept. 24, 2012, ECF No. 35) is granted in part and denied in part. The motion to sever count V of Precisions Answer and Counterclaims is GRANTED, and this count of the Answer and Counterclaims is DISMISSED from this action as improperly joined. The motion to strike the remainder of Precisions Answer and Counterclaims is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 5/10/13. (km)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avco Corporation v. Precision Airmotive LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avco Corporation
Represented By: Veronica Winter Saltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precision Airmotive LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]