UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. LORENO et al

Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: LARRY A. LORENO, DARLENE A. LORENO, MERCER COUNTY TAX CLAIM BUREAU, GREENVILLE BOROUGH, BANK OF AMERICA, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA and CRAWFORD COUNTY TAX CLAIM BUREAU
Case Number: 1:2010cv00183
Filed: July 28, 2010
Court: Pennsylvania Western District Court
Office: Erie Office
County: Crawford
Presiding Judge: Sean J. McLaughlin
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 10, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: AND NOW, to wit, this 10th Day of June, 2013, this Court having considered the Motion for Default Judgment 32 and supporting memorandum filed on behalf of the Plaintiff, United States of America, and there being no filings in opposition to said motion by any of the Defendants against whom default judgment is being sought, IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Motion for Default Judgment 32 filed on behalf of the United States of America shall be, and hereby is, GRANTED and Judgment shall be entered in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 58(a) against Defendants Mercer County Tax Claim Bureau, Greenville Borough, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania Department of Revenue, Crawford County Tax Claim Bureau, Darlene A. Loreno. Signed by Chief Judge Sean J. McLaughlin on 6/10/13. (kas)
June 10, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF JUDGMENT: AND NOW, to wit, this 10th Day of June, 2013, this Court having entered an Order granting the Motion for Default Judgment 32 filed on behalf of the Plaintiff, United States of America, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that: 1. Defendants Mercer County Tax Claim Bureau, Greenville Borough, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania Department of Revenue, and Crawford County Tax Claim Bureau do not have an interest in the real and personal property at issue in this action; and 2. Defendant Darlene A. Loreno shall be, and hereby is, precluded from preventing the sale of the subject real and personal property and from asserting any defense in this case. Signed by Chief Judge Sean J. McLaughlin on 6/10/2013. (kas)
June 12, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: AND NOW, to wit, this 12th Day of June, 2013, for the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 38 shall be, and hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion for Summary Judgment filed on behalf of Defendant Larry A. Loreno 34 shall be, and hereby is, DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Sean J. McLaughlin on 6/12/13. (kas)
March 26, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 56 United States' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Counts II, III, IV and VII, as explained therein. Signed by Judge Terrence F. McVerry on 3/26/14. (mh, )
November 26, 2014 94 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 84 USA's Motion to Compel Discovery responses by Larry Loreno; finding Loreno in civil contempt of court; and issuing an arrest warrant to begin on December 8, 2014, as explained therein. Attorney Bartholomew to deliver this Opinion to Loreno FORTHWITH.. Signed by Judge Terrence F. McVerry on 11/26/14. (mh, )
December 8, 2014 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to effectuate finding of civil contempt of court and denying request to hold contempt and post-judgment discovery in abeyance, and ordering arrest warrant for Larry Loreno, as explained therein. Signed by Judge Terrence F. McVerry on 12/8/14. (mh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. LORENO et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: E. Christopher Lambert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LARRY A. LORENO
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DARLENE A. LORENO
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCER COUNTY TAX CLAIM BUREAU
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREENVILLE BOROUGH
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRAWFORD COUNTY TAX CLAIM BUREAU
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]