GARY MILLER IMPORTS, INC. v. DOOLITTLE et al

Defendant: KEVIN DOOLITTLE, LANDMARK CHEVROLET, INC., CARTER DOOLITTLE and BRENT DOOLITTLE
Plaintiff: GARY MILLER IMPORTS, INC.
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00178
Filed: August 19, 2011
 
Court: Pennsylvania Western District Court
Office: Erie Office
County: Erie
Presiding Judge: Sean J. McLaughlin
 
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 25, 2013 27 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION on Plaintiffs' Moton to Compel 20 , indicating that said Motion will be granted. An appropriate Order will be entered. Signed by Judge Maurice B. Cohill on 2/25/2013. (rtw, )
August 7, 2014 55 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER re 43 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena filed by GARY MILLER IMPORTS, INC. indicating that the Court preliminarily denies the motion pending the Court's in camera review of the withheld material as more fully stated in the Opinion. Signed by Judge Maurice B. Cohill on 8/7/2014. (rtw)
August 15, 2014 56 Featured Case ORDER denying 43 Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena for the reasons set forth in the Court's August 7, 2014 55 Memorandum Opinion and Order and following an in camera review of the withheld material. Signed by Judge Maurice B. Cohill on 8/15/14. (rtw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: GARY MILLER IMPORTS, INC. v. DOOLITTLE et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN DOOLITTLE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANDMARK CHEVROLET, INC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARTER DOOLITTLE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRENT DOOLITTLE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY MILLER IMPORTS, INC.
Represented By: John F. Mizner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]