KIRSCHNER v. WACHOVIA CAPITAL MARKETS, LLC et al

Plaintiff: MARC S. KIRSCHNER
Defendant: WACHOVIA CAPITAL MARKETS, LLC, WACHOVIA BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, CIT GROUP/EQUIPMENT FINANCING, INC., KRONES, INC., KRONES AG, VOLKER KRONSEDER, HEINZ SOMMER, MARSHALL FINANCIAL, INC., MARSHALL INVESTMENTS CORPORATION, THE POLLINGER COMPANY, INC., DONALD K. POLLINGER, PAUL POLLINGER, GREGORY J. PODLUCKY, JONATHAN E. PODLUCKY, DAVID E. GETZIK, ROBERT B. LYNN and ANDREW MURIN, JR.
 
Case Number: 2:2008cv01518
Filed: October 31, 2008
 
Court: Pennsylvania Western District Court
Office: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David S. Cercone
 
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2009 120 Featured Case ORDER denying 85 Defendants' (Krones AG, Krones Inc., Heinz Sommer, and Dr. Volker Kronseder) Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on September 16, 2009. (lmt)
September 16, 2009 121 Featured Case ORDER denying 90 Motion to Dismiss; denying 92 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 9/16/09. (slh)
September 16, 2009 122 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 88 Motion to Dismiss. AND now, this 16th day of September, 2009, upon consideration of the Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC d/b/a Wachovia Securities and Wachovia Bank, National Association (Docket No. 88 ), it is ordered that said Motion is granted in part and denied in part. Count Ten (against Wachovia for Breach of Fiduciary Duty) is dismissed, with prejudice. The motion is denied in all other respects. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 09/16/2009. (sps, )
October 23, 2009 141 Featured Case ORDER denying 127 Wachovia Securities' and Wachovia Bank, National Association's Motion for Reconsideration; denying 129 Krones AG's, Krones Inc.'s, Heinz Sommer's, and Dr. Volker Kronseder's Motion for Reconsideration; denying 130 CIT Group/Equipment Financing, Inc.'s Motion for Reconsideration; and terminating CIT Group/Equipment Financing, Inc.'s Motion for Joinder. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 10/23/2009. (lmt)
February 2, 2012 325 Featured Case SEALED ORDER denying 297 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying 300 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting in part and denying in part 304 Sealed Motion; denying 306 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting in part and denying in part 307 Sealed Motion. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 2/2/12. (ask) Modified on 2/2/2012 to indicate document is sealed. (ksa) Per conversation with chambers, document has been unsealed. Modified on 2/2/2012. (ept)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: KIRSCHNER v. WACHOVIA CAPITAL MARKETS, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARC S. KIRSCHNER
Represented By: Roy E. Leonard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WACHOVIA CAPITAL MARKETS, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WACHOVIA BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIT GROUP/EQUIPMENT FINANCING, INC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRONES, INC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRONES AG
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VOLKER KRONSEDER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEINZ SOMMER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARSHALL FINANCIAL, INC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARSHALL INVESTMENTS CORPORATION
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE POLLINGER COMPANY, INC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD K. POLLINGER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL POLLINGER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY J. PODLUCKY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JONATHAN E. PODLUCKY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID E. GETZIK
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT B. LYNN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW MURIN, JR.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]