SIMON PROPERTY GROUP, INC. et al v. PALOMBARO et al

Plaintiff: SIMON PROPERTY GROUP, INC., SIMON PROPERTY GROUP, L.P., NORTHGATE MALL PARTNERSHIP and SHOPPING CENTER ASSOCIATES
Defendant: MARK M. PALOMBARO, ABBY, INC., ROBERT E. CRAWFORD, R.E. CRAWFORD CONSTRUCTION, INC., MATTHEW W. PADGETT, JOEL D. SENCHUR, DREAM BUILDERS AND DESIGNERS, LLC, JEFFREY T. SMITH, R.E. CRAWFORD CONSTRUCTION, LLC, PARAGON BUILDERS, LLC, J.A.C. CONSTRUCTION CONSULTING LLC and JEFFREY A. USELTON
Case Number: 2:2008cv01634
Filed: November 26, 2008
Court: Pennsylvania Western District Court
Office: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Gary L. Lancaster
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 24, 2008 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Stipulation of Counsel for Extension of Time to Respond; Answer of defendants MARK M. PALOMBARO and ABBY, INC. due 1/26/2009. Signed by Judge Gary L. Lancaster on 12/24/08. (map)
March 30, 2009 50 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and ORDER denying 26 Motion to Stay Civil Proceedings. Signed by Judge Gary L. Lancaster on 3/30/09. (map)
December 4, 2008 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiffs to file a RICO case statement by 12/24/2008. Signed by Judge Gary L. Lancaster on 12/4/08. (map)
January 28, 2010 76 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and ORDER granting 65 Motion to Dismiss Counts II and III of defendant R.E. Crawford Construction, Inc.'s Counterclaim and Defendant R.E. Crawford Construction, LLC's Counterclaim, without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Lancaster on 1/28/10. (map)
February 13, 2010 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 78 Motion to Amend Counterclaims; Defendants, R. E. Crawford Construction, Inc. and R. E. Crawford Construction, LLC may file their Amended Counterclaims within ten (10) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Gary L. Lancaster on 2/12/10. (map)
February 22, 2010 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 80 Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Amended Counterclaims; Amended Counterclaims of defendants R.E. CRAWFORD CONSTRUCTION, INC. and R.E. CRAWFORD CONSTRUCTION, LLC shall by filed by 3/14/2010. Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Lancaster on 2/22/10. (map)
March 23, 2010 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 82 Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Amended Counterclaims; Amended Counterclaims of defendants R.E. CRAWFORD CONSTRUCTION, INC. and R.E. CRAWFORD CONSTRUCTION, LLC shall be due by 4/12/2010. Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Lancaster on 3/23/10. (map)
April 18, 2010 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 84 Stipulation of Dismissal of all claims and counterclaims, with prejudice, as to defendants R.E. CRAWFORD CONSTRUCTION, LLC, R.E. CRAWFORD CONSTRUCTION, LLC, ROBERT E. CRAWFORD, MATTHEW W. PADGETT, JOEL D. SENCHUR, DREAM BUILDERS A ND DESIGNERS, LLC, JEFFREY T. SMITH, PARAGON BUILDERS, LLC, J.A.C. CONSTRUCTION CONSULTING LLC, and JEFFREY A. USELTON, each party to bear its own costs and fees; This Court shall retain jurisdiction of this action and such parties for the purpose of interpreting and enforcing the Settlement Agreement of and between such parties; Nothing herein shall stay or dismiss Plaintiffs' claims against remaining defendants Mark Palombaro or Abby, Inc.. Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Lancaster on 4/16/10. (map)
April 23, 2010 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 86 Request for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order and incorporating the terms and conditions stated more fully in order. Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Lancaster on 4/23/10. (map)
August 2, 2010 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 90 Stipulation and Order for Consent Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Lancaster on 8/2/10. (map)
August 2, 2010 92 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT JUDGMENT entered in favor of plaintiffs SIMON PROPERTY GROUP, L.P. and GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANIES, as subrogee of Simon Property Group, L.P., and against defendants MARK M. PALOMBARO and ABBY, INC., jointly and severally, on Counts V (Breach of Fiduciary Duty as to Palombaro) and VI (Aiding and Abetting Breach of Fiduciary Duty as to Abby) of the Amended Complaint in this action, in the aggregate amount of $766,000.00. Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Lancaster on 8/2/10. (map)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SIMON PROPERTY GROUP, INC. et al v. PALOMBARO et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIMON PROPERTY GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Pamela A. McCallum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIMON PROPERTY GROUP, L.P.
Represented By: Pamela A. McCallum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORTHGATE MALL PARTNERSHIP
Represented By: Pamela A. McCallum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHOPPING CENTER ASSOCIATES
Represented By: Pamela A. McCallum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK M. PALOMBARO
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABBY, INC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT E. CRAWFORD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.E. CRAWFORD CONSTRUCTION, INC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW W. PADGETT
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOEL D. SENCHUR
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DREAM BUILDERS AND DESIGNERS, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY T. SMITH
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.E. CRAWFORD CONSTRUCTION, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARAGON BUILDERS, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.A.C. CONSTRUCTION CONSULTING LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY A. USELTON
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]