POHL v. UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY et al

Plaintiff: AMY K. POHL
Defendant: UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH and NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF ENVIRONMENTAL HEALTH SCIENCES
 
Case Number: 2:2009cv01480
Filed: November 5, 2009
 
Court: Pennsylvania Western District Court
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Butler
Presiding Judge: William L. Standish
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 3, 2010 12 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION re: 9 MOTION to Transfer Case to Non-binding Arbitration filed by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY and UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, and 10 MOTION for Relief from Alternative Dispute Resolution, MOTION for Assignment to Magistrate Judge and MOTION to Lift Discovery Stay filed by AMY K. POHL. Signed by Judge William L. Standish on 3/2/2010. (md)
June 25, 2010 26 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION re: 20 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by AMY K. POHL. Signed by Judge William L. Standish on 6/24/2010. (md)
October 29, 2010 48 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part 30 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William L. Standish on 10/28/2010. (cs)
November 2, 2010 51 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND OPINION granting 32 motion for a protective order and to stay discovery. Signed by Judge William L. Standish on 11/2/2010. (cs)
March 7, 2012 94 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re: 79 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by AMY K. POHL. Signed by Judge William L. Standish on 03/06/2012. (md)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: POHL v. UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMY K. POHL
Represented By: Paul J. Jalsevac
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF ENVIRONMENTAL HEALTH SCIENCES
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]