WESTMORELAND OPPORTUNITY FUND, LLC v. ZAPPALA et al

Plaintiff: WESTMORELAND OPPORTUNITY FUND, LLC
Defendant: RICHARD A. ZAPPALA, FRANK J. ZAPPALA and RONALD A. ROSENFELD
Case Number: 2:2013cv00456
Filed: March 27, 2013
Court: Pennsylvania Western District Court
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Allegheny
Presiding Judge: Nora Barry Fischer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 22, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER indicating that, for reasons stated more fully within said Order, Plaintiff shall file its Amended Complaint by 8/5/13 at 12:00 p.m.; that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 9 is denied, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 7/22/13. (jg) Modified on 7/22/2013. (jg, )
October 28, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION indicating that, for reasons more fully stated within, as to Counts I and III of its First Amended Complaint, Plaintiff has pled sufficient facts which demonstrate a presumptive right to recovery against Defendants under the " Principals' Indemnification Agreement." However, Plaintiff has not adequately pled enough of the facts necessary to sustain its claims under Count II of its First Amended Complaint. Accordingly, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. 20 ) Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Docket No. 19 ) is granted, in part, and denied, in part. Plaintiff's claims under Count II will be dismissed, without prejudice. Appropriate Orders follow. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 10/28/13. (jg)
July 11, 2014 74 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION indicating that, for the reasons more fully stated within, Plaintiff's Motion for Summary 37 will be granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff's Motion will be granted with respect to the scope of the Defendants� 39; liability for alleged Section 22(b) violations of the Mortgage. The Motion will be denied, without prejudice, with respect to whether Defendants' liability has, in fact, been triggered. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 41 will be denied. An appropriate Order follows. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 7/11/14. (rlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WESTMORELAND OPPORTUNITY FUND, LLC v. ZAPPALA et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESTMORELAND OPPORTUNITY FUND, LLC
Represented By: David W. Lampl
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD A. ZAPPALA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANK J. ZAPPALA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD A. ROSENFELD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]