PARMS v. HARPER

Petitioner: NIGEL DWAYNE PARMS
Respondent: ORLANDO HARPER
Case Number: 2:2013cv00582
Filed: April 22, 2013
Court: Pennsylvania Western District Court
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Allegheny
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing 20 Motion to Dismiss filed by PENNSYLVANIA BOARD OF PROBATION AND PAROLE. ORLANDO HARPER answer due 10/4/2013; PENNSYLVANIA BOARD OF PROBATION AND PAROLE answer due 10/4/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell on 9/23/2013. (spc)
October 7, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re 4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by NIGEL DWAYNE PARMS dismissing petition and denying a certificate of appealability. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell on 10/07/2013. (Mitchell, Robert)
May 6, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re 4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by NIGEL DWAYNE PARMS transferring petition to the Court of Appeals for consideration as a successive petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert C. Mitchell on 05/06/2013. (Mitchell, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PARMS v. HARPER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NIGEL DWAYNE PARMS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ORLANDO HARPER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]