Asociacion de Industriales de Puerto Rico v. MarketNext, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Asociacion de Industriales de Puerto Rico
Defendant: MarketNext, Inc., Edison R. Misla-Grillasca, Yvette Olivero-Vasquez, Conjugal Partnership Misla-Olivero, Graphic Print & Design, Inc., Guillermo Aviles-Aguirrechea, Jane Doe and Conjugal Partnership Aviles-Doe
 
Case Number: 3:2009cv01122
Filed: February 10, 2009
 
Court: Puerto Rico District Court
Office: Trademark Office
County: San Juan
Presiding Judge: Jose A Fuste
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:44 Trademark Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 11, 2009 46 Featured Case ORDER granting 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants are enjoined from using in commerce any trademark or trade name incorporating, in whole or in part, the term Industriales, etc., as more fully described in the attached expanded Order. Defendants shall comply with the terms of this Order within 10 days and certify by sworn affidavit: 1) their compliance detailing the steps they have taken to ensure compliance and, 2) the employees, of ficers, agents, servants, employees, attorneys, parent companies, successors, affiliates, assigns, and other persons to whom they have communicated this Order. Plaintiff AIPR must post a duly-qualified surety bond in the amount of 20,000.00 within seventy-two (72) hours following the date of this Order. A Memorandum Opinion will follow. Signed by Chief Judge Jose A Fuste on 3/11/09. (mrj)
March 23, 2009 58 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION, AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. We reinstate the preliminary injunction against Defendants, Docket No. 46 , and ORDER the Defendants to show cause, on or before April 3, 2009, as to why the preliminary injunction should not be converted into a permanent injunction. Show Cause Response due by 4/3/2009. Signed by Chief Judge Jose A Fuste on 3/23/09.(mrj)
March 31, 2009 70 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 64 MOTION for compliance filed by Asociacion de Industriales de Puerto Rico. Defendants are ORDERED to: (a) Distribute the text of our Order, Docket No. 46 , and our memorandum opinion, Docket No. 58 , in full, to all their subscr ibers, clients, and vendors, including all persons who have purchased advertisements in Defendants' magazine, and any other person with legal or economic interest in their publication; (b) Faithfully reproduce the following notice in bold, all c apital letters, single-space, and monospace Courier font no smaller than one pica (twelve-point), in both English and Spanish, on the second or third page of each copy of their issues of Empresarios for the term of one year: (1) EMPRESARIOS IS NOT RE LATED TO INDUSTRIALES MAGAZINE IN ANY WAY, AND IS NOT A CONTINUATION, SUCCESSOR, OR MODIFICATION OF INDUSTRIALES; (2) MARKETNEXT, INC. NO LONGER PUBLISHES INDUSTRIALES FOR THE PUERTO RICO MANUFACTURERS' ASSOCIATION (PRMA) AND EMPRESARIOS IS NOT AN AUTHORIZED PUBLICATION OF THE PRMA; and (c) Certify by sworn affidavit their compliance with the present order by not later than April 13, 2009. Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 4/13/2009. Signed by Chief Judge Jose A Fuste on 3/31/09.(mrj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Asociacion de Industriales de Puerto Rico v. MarketNext, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asociacion de Industriales de Puerto Rico
Represented By: Ramon G. Vela-Cordova
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MarketNext, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edison R. Misla-Grillasca
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yvette Olivero-Vasquez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Misla-Olivero
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graphic Print & Design, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guillermo Aviles-Aguirrechea
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Aviles-Doe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]