Catlin (Syndicate 2003) at Lloyds et al v. San Juan Towing & Marine Services, Inc.

Consol_defendant: Catlin (Syndicate 2003) at Lloyds
Consol_plaintiff: San Juan Towing & Marine Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Catlin (Syndicate 2003) at Lloyds
Defendant: San Juan Towing & Marine Services, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv02093
Filed: November 8, 2011
 
Court: Puerto Rico District Court
Office: San Juan Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Francisco A. Besosa
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 05:75(2) Contract - Reduction in Grade
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 8, 2013 112 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER re 78 motion for summary judgment; and re 99 Report and Recommendation. The Court REJECTS the recommendations contained in the magistrate judge's Report and Recommendation (Docket No. 99). The Court GRANTS defendant SJT's motion for partial summary judgment (Docket No. 78), and dismisses case number 11-2093 without prejudice. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 04/08/2013. (brc)
May 13, 2013 121 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re 114 Motion for Reconsideration and 115 Motion for Reconsideration. Because the insurance policy at issue between the parties resembles marine insurance, and because the policy insures a maritime interest against maritime risks, it is a maritime contract warranting admiralty jurisdiction. Plaintiff Catlin's complaint also properly pled diversity jurisdiction. Accordingly, the Court vacates its judgment dismissing Case No. 11-2093 without prejudice, (Docket No. 113). The Clerk will reopen Case No. 11-2093. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 05/13/2013. (brc)
July 30, 2013 157 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER re 134 motion for summary judgment; and re 136 motion for summary judgment. The Court GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART Catlin's motion for summary judgment. The Court GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART SJT's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 07/30/2013. (brc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Catlin (Syndicate 2003) at Lloyds et al v. San Juan Towing & Marine Services, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Catlin (Syndicate 2003) at Lloyds
Represented By: Marco A. Gonzalez, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: San Juan Towing & Marine Services, Inc.
Represented By: Ian P. Carvajal-Zarabozo
Represented By: Manuel Sosa-Baez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catlin (Syndicate 2003) at Lloyds
Represented By: Marco A. Gonzalez, Jr.
Represented By: James W. Carbin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Juan Towing & Marine Services, Inc.
Represented By: Manuel Sosa-Baez
Represented By: Ian P. Carvajal-Zarabozo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]